Labey v. Barclays Bank Delaware
Plaintiff: Gina Labey
Defendant: Barclays Bank Delaware
Case Number: 0:2019cv02844
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15:1693
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gina Labey (Hartz, Bennett)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on #7 Stipulation. Barclays Bank Delaware answer due 12/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 11/22/2019. (JLB)
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 Stipulation. (Schroeder, Mark)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION (Second) Extending Time for Defendant Barclays Bank Delaware to Respond to Complaint by Barclays Bank Delaware. Jointly Signed by Gina Labey. (Schroeder, Mark)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER on #3 Stipulation. Barclays Bank Delaware answer due 11/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 11/8/2019. (JLB)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Barclays Bank Delaware is wholly owned by Barclays Group US Inc., which is owned by Barclays US LLC. Barclays US LLC is a wholly owned subsidiary of Barclays Bank, PLC, which is a wholly owned subsidiary of Barclays, PLC. (Schroeder, Mark) Modified text on 11/8/2019 (MKB).
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Extending Time For Defendant to Respond to Complaint #3 Stipulation. (Schroeder, Mark)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant Barclays Bank Delaware to Respond to Complaint by Barclays Bank Delaware. Jointly Signed by Gina Labey. (Schroeder, Mark)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-2844 (PJS/LIB). (KNK)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey County (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7254470) filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service) (Schroeder, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Labey v. Barclays Bank Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Labey
Represented By: Bennett Hartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank Delaware
Represented By: Mark G Schroeder
Represented By: Frank Cameron Bliss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?