Olsem v. Hy-Vee, Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert Paul Olsem
Defendant: Hy-Vee, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv02885
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Hy-Vee, Inc.. (Lindquist, Jeffrey)
January 3, 2020 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Hy-Vee, Inc.. (Lindquist, Jeffrey)
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint filed by Hy-Vee, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Notice of Appearance) (Lindquist, Jeffrey)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Paul Olsem. Hy-Vee, Inc. served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (Malters, James)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 FILED IN ERROR - WILL BE REFILED. Return of Service Executed for Summons/Complaint/Demand for Jury Trial served on Michael Jurgens on 11/20/2019, filed by Robert Paul Olsem. (Malters, James) Modified text on 11/27/2019 (KDS).
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hy-Vee, Inc. (kt)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-2885 NEB/DTS. (kt)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hy-Vee, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7267341) filed by Robert Paul Olsem. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Malters, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olsem v. Hy-Vee, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hy-Vee, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Gabor
Represented By: Jeffrey J Lindquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Paul Olsem
Represented By: James E Malters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?