Van v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Lynn Tuyet Van
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 0:2019cv02891
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
2 Judge: John R Tunheim
3 Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (Text-Only) ORDER on #10 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer. The Stipulation is GRANTED. United States of America answer due 3/2/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 1/9/2020. (KAT)
January 8, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 Stipulation. (Alexander, James)
January 8, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER by United States of America. Jointly Signed by Lynn Tuyet Van. (Alexander, James)
January 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James S Alexander on behalf of United States of America. (Alexander, James)
November 25, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez for all further proceedings. Chief Judge John R. Tunheim, Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-2891 (WMW/KMM). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim and Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 11/21/2019. (MKB)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lynn Tuyet Van. United States of America served on 11/14/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Goetz, Frederick)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lynn Tuyet Van re #1 Complaint, #3 Summons Issued (Goetz, Frederick)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lynn Tuyet Van re #1 Complaint, #3 Summons Issued (Goetz, Frederick)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to The Court of Related Cases by Lynn Tuyet Van (Goetz, Frederick) Modified text on 11/14/2019 (lmb).
November 12, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (MMP)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd & 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-2891 (JRT/HB). (MMP)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7267869) filed by Lynn Tuyet Van. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Goetz, Frederick) Modified text on 11/13/2019 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Tuyet Van
Represented By: Frederick J. Goetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: James S Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?