Jones v. 681 Properties LLP et al
Plaintiff: Dominique Jones
Defendant: 681 Properties LLP and Hanbery & Turner, P.A.
Case Number: 0:2019cv02946
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Donovan W Frank
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER on #13 Stipulation. Hanbery & Turner, P.A. answer due 2/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 1/8/2020. (HAM)
January 8, 2020 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #13 Stipulation. (Newman, Patrick)
January 8, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Hanbery & Turner, P.A. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Hanbery & Turner, P.A.. Jointly Signed by 681 Properties LLP. (Newman, Patrick)
January 6, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #10 First MOTION to Dismiss/General First MOTION to Disqualify Counsel : Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7C (STP) before Judge Donovan W. Frank. (Iris, Mark)
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 First MOTION to Dismiss/General First MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Dominique Jones.(Iris, Mark)
December 31, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION to Dismiss/General , First MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Dominique Jones. (Attachments: #1 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. Notice of Motion, #2 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. Memorandum and Word Certificate)(Iris, Mark) Modified text on 1/3/2020 (CLK).
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on #7 Stipulation. Hanbery & Turner, P.A. answer due 1/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 12/18/2019. (HAM)
December 18, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 Stipulation. (Newman, Patrick)
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, To Extend Time to Respond by Hanbery & Turner, P.A.. Jointly Signed by Dominique Jones. (Newman, Patrick)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 Separate ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Dominique Jones. filed by 681 Properties LLP. (Kalla, Christopher)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dominique Jones. Hanbery & Turner, P.A. served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (Iris, Mark)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dominique Jones. 681 Properties LLP served on 11/26/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. (Iris, Mark)
November 22, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Donovan W. Frank's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these practice pointers, in addition to the District of Minnesota's Local Rules and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (las)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to 681 Properties LLP, Hanbery & Turner, P.A. (MTP)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per 3rd/4th Housing/Accommodations/ADA list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-2946 DWF/TNL. (MTP)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 681 Properties LLP, Hanbery & Turner P.A. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7289832) filed by Dominique Jones. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Iris, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. 681 Properties LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominique Jones
Represented By: Mark Iris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 681 Properties LLP
Represented By: Douglass E Turner
Represented By: Christopher T Kalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanbery & Turner, P.A.
Represented By: Patrick D Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?