Barclay v. Icon Health & Fitness, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Teeda Barclay
Defendant: NordicTrack, Inc. and Icon Health & Fitness, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv02970
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER on #13 Stipulation. Icon Health & Fitness, Inc. answer due 2/24/2020; NordicTrack, Inc. answer due 2/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 1/6/2020. (TJB)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. ICON Health & Fitness, Inc. is a corporate parent of Defendant NordicTrack, Inc.. (Zhao, X)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. HF Holdings, Inc. is a corporate parent of Defendants Icon Health & Fitness, Inc., NordicTrack, Inc. (Zhao, X)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #13 Stipulation. (Zhao, X)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION to Extend Deadlines to Respond by Icon Health & Fitness, Inc., NordicTrack, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Teeda Barclay, ICON Health & Fitness, Inc., and NordicTrack, Inc.. (Zhao, X)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlinrose H. Fisher on behalf of All Defendants. (Fisher, Caitlinrose)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence M. Shapiro on behalf of All Defendants. (Shapiro, Lawrence)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by X Kevin Zhao on behalf of Icon Health & Fitness, Inc., NordicTrack, Inc.. (Zhao, X)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Teeda Barclay. Icon Health & Fitness, Inc. waiver sent on 12/2/2019, answer due 1/31/2020. (Bleichner, Bryan)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Terry Coates for Teeda Barclay; granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Wilbert B Markovits for Teeda Barclay; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Justin C Walker for Teeda Barclay. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 11/27/2019. (NAH)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Justin C. Walker. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7302153 filed by Teeda Barclay. (Bleichner, Bryan)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney W.B. Markovits. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7302127 filed by Teeda Barclay. (Bleichner, Bryan)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Terence R. Coates. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7302092 filed by Teeda Barclay. (Bleichner, Bryan)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing W.B. Markovits, Terence R. Coates, Justin C. Walker as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MKB)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Icon Health & Fitness, Inc., NordicTrack, Inc.. (MKB)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-2970 (ECT/DTS). (MKB)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Icon Health & Fitness, Inc., NordicTrack, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7295176) filed by Teeda Barclay. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bleichner, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barclay v. Icon Health & Fitness, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teeda Barclay
Represented By: Nathan D Prosser
Represented By: Bryan L. Bleichner
Represented By: Karl L Cambronne
Represented By: Wilbert B Markovits
Represented By: Justin C Walker
Represented By: Terry Coates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NordicTrack, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Shapiro
Represented By: Caitlinrose H. Fisher
Represented By: X. Kevin Zhao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Icon Health & Fitness, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence M. Shapiro
Represented By: Caitlinrose H. Fisher
Represented By: X. Kevin Zhao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?