Palm Sr v. US Trustee
Appellee: William Benzick, US Trustee and Perry M. Rynders
Appellant: Michael N Palm Sr
Case Number: 0:2019cv02972
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF RECEIPT AND ASSIGNMENT IN RE: BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL re #1 NOTICE of APPEAL from United States Bankruptcy Court. (lmb) Modified text/link on 1/2/2020 (lmb).
December 26, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(1), the Clerk of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Minnesota gives notice that the record for this appeal is available electronically.(SMD)
December 5, 2019 Filing 5 BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL for Bankruptcy Court Case Number 19-41010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Order Denying Stay Appeal)(SMD)
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. This case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-2972 DSD/TNL. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (kt)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd/4th Bankruptcy list. Please use case number 19-cv-2972 DSD. (KDS)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT OF ISSUES by Appellant Michael N Palm Sr.(SMD)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of APPEAL from United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Minnesota. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-41010. filed by Michael N Palm Sr. (Attachments: #1 Election to U.S. District Court, #2 Clerk's Notice on Appeal, #3 Identification of Residence, #4 Order on Appeal, #5 Stay Pending Appeal, #6 BKY Docket) (SMD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palm Sr v. US Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: William Benzick
Represented By: James C Brand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: US Trustee
Represented By: Sarah J Wencil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Perry M. Rynders
Represented By: James C Brand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Michael N Palm Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?