Phillips v. Sheehy
Plaintiff: Lametra Phillips
Defendant: Kathleen D. Sheehy
Case Number: 0:2019cv02996
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Filing 5 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(CLK)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER adopting #3 Report and Recommendation: dismissing this action without prejudice; and denying #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 1/10/2020. (SMD)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint, filed by Lametra Phillips, #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Lametra Phillips filed by Lametra Phillips. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 12/19/2019. (TJB)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Lametra Phillips. (JGK) Qc'd on 12/27/2019 (KNK).
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kathleen D. Sheehy filed by Lametra Phillips. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (JGK) Qc'd on 12/27/2019 (KNK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Sheehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen D. Sheehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lametra Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?