Pavek et al v. Simon
Plaintiff: DCCC, Madeline Pavek, DSCC and Ethan Sykes
Defendant: Steve Simon
Case Number: 0:2019cv03000
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by DCCC, DSCC, Madeline Pavek, Ethan Sykes. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Dunlop, Sybil)
December 27, 2019 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #13 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Steve Simon.(Hartshorn, Nathan)
December 27, 2019 Filing 16 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #13 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Steve Simon.(Hartshorn, Nathan)
December 27, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Steve Simon. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hartshorn, Nathan)
December 27, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #13 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Hartshorn, Nathan)
December 27, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Steve Simon. (Hartshorn, Nathan)
December 11, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Madeline Pavek, DCCC, DSCC, Ethan Sykes. Steve Simon served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (Dunlop, Sybil)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jyoti Jasrasaria for DCCC, DSCC, Madeline Pavek, and for Ethan Sykes. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 12/5/2019. (NAH)
December 3, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jyoti Jasrasaria. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7313457 filed by DCCC, DSCC, Madeline Pavek, Ethan Sykes. (Dunlop, Sybil)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Alexi Machek Velez for DCCC, DSCC, Madeline Pavek and for Ethan Sykes; granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kevin J. Hamilton for DCCC, DSCC, Madeline Pavek and for Ethan Sykes; granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Marc E Elias for DCCC, DSCC, Madeline Pavek and for Ethan Sykes. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 12/3/2019. (NAH)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Steve Simon. (MKB)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-3000 (SRN/DTS). (MKB)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Marc Erik Elias. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7305301 filed by DCCC, DSCC, Madeline Pavek, Ethan Sykes. (Dunlop, Sybil)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kevin J. Hamilton. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7305298 filed by DCCC, DSCC, Madeline Pavek, Ethan Sykes. (Dunlop, Sybil)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Alexi M. Velez. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7305288 filed by DCCC, DSCC, Madeline Pavek, Ethan Sykes. (Dunlop, Sybil)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiffs DCCC, DSCC, Madeline Pavek, Ethan Sykes. (Dunlop, Sybil)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiffs DCCC, DSCC, Madeline Pavek, Ethan Sykes. (Dunlop, Sybil)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Steve Simon (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7305144) filed by Madeline Pavek, DCCC, DSCC, Ethan Sykes. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dunlop, Sybil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pavek et al v. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Simon
Represented By: Nathan J Hartshorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DCCC
Represented By: Sybil L Dunlop
Represented By: Katherine M. Swenson
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Marc E Elias
Represented By: Jyoti Jasrasaria
Represented By: Alexi Machek Velez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madeline Pavek
Represented By: Sybil L Dunlop
Represented By: Katherine M. Swenson
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Marc E Elias
Represented By: Jyoti Jasrasaria
Represented By: Alexi Machek Velez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DSCC
Represented By: Sybil L Dunlop
Represented By: Katherine M. Swenson
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Marc E Elias
Represented By: Jyoti Jasrasaria
Represented By: Alexi Machek Velez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethan Sykes
Represented By: Sybil L Dunlop
Represented By: Katherine M. Swenson
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Marc E Elias
Represented By: Jyoti Jasrasaria
Represented By: Alexi Machek Velez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?