Laffen v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Megan Laffen
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 0:2019cv03049
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Megan Laffen (Hartz, Bennett)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Second Stipulated and Agreed Motion for Extension of Time of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. The time for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. to answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to the Complaint in this action is extended up to and including January 27, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 1/10/2020. (JMK)
January 10, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 Motion for Extension of Time (General). (Volpe, Patricia)
January 10, 2020 Filing 10 Second MOTION for Extension of Time filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Volpe, Patricia)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Stipulated and Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. The time for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. to answer, move, or otherwise plead in response to the Complaint in this action is extended up to and including January 13, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 12/17/2019. (JMK)
December 13, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 Motion for Extension of Time (General). (Volpe, Patricia)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Volpe, Patricia)
December 13, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-3049 JRT/HB. (MMG)
December 10, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re #3 Notice (Other) (Volpe, Patricia)
December 10, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Volpe, Patricia)
December 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re #1 Notice of Removal, Notification to State Court of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Volpe, Patricia)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Chase is a wholly-owned subsidiary of JPMorgan Chase & Co.(Volpe, Patricia) Modified text on 12/10/2019 (MMP).
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7324869) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Volpe, Patricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laffen v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Patricia E Volpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Laffen
Represented By: Bennett Hartz
Represented By: Andrew C Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?