Granite Re, Inc. v. Hutton, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Granite Re, Inc.
Defendant: Scott Hutton, Lisa Hutton, David Hutton, Paulette Hutton, Judy Hutton, Nicollet County, Dan Hutton and Hutton, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv03074
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian S McCool on behalf of David Hutton, Paulette Hutton, Hutton, Inc.. (McCool, Brian)
February 7, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark W Vyvyan on behalf of David Hutton, Paulette Hutton, Hutton, Inc.. (Vyvyan, Mark)
February 6, 2020 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendants David Hutton, Paulette Hutton, Hutton, Inc.. (Mills, Amanda)
February 6, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Sicoli Mills on behalf of David Hutton, Paulette Hutton, Hutton, Inc.. (Mills, Amanda)
January 23, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT Third against All Defendants. filed by Granite Re, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service) (Gregerson, David) Modified text on 1/24/2020 (MKB).
January 22, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Granite Re, Inc. re #11 Amended Complaint, (Gregerson, David)
January 22, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against Dan Hutton, David Hutton, Judy Hutton, Lisa Hutton, Paulette Hutton, Scott Hutton, Hutton, Inc., Nicollet County. filed by Granite Re, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A) (Gregerson, David)
January 10, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Granite Re, Inc.. David Hutton waiver sent on 12/16/2019, answer due 2/14/2020; Paulette Hutton waiver sent on 12/16/2019, answer due 2/14/2020; Hutton, Inc. waiver sent on 12/16/2019, answer due 2/14/2020. (Gregerson, Daniel) Modified text on 1/13/2020 (MKB).
January 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger C Justin on behalf of Nicollet County. (Justin, Roger)
January 7, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Granite Re, Inc.. Dan Hutton waiver sent on 12/16/2019, answer due 2/14/2020; Judy Hutton waiver sent on 12/16/2019, answer due 2/14/2020; Lisa Hutton waiver sent on 12/16/2019, answer due 2/14/2020; Scott Hutton waiver sent on 12/16/2019, answer due 2/14/2020. (Gregerson, Daniel) Modified text on 1/8/2020 (MKB).
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Granite Re, Inc.. Nicollet County waiver sent on 12/16/2019, answer due 2/14/2020. (Gregerson, David) Modified text on 12/20/2019 (MKB).
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Dan Hutton, David Hutton, Judy Hutton, Lisa Hutton, Paulette Hutton, Scott Hutton, Hutton, Inc., Nicollet County. (MKB)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants. filed by Granite Re, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Revised) (Gregerson, David)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Dan Hutton, David Hutton, Judy Hutton, Lisa Hutton, Paulette Hutton, Scott Hutton, Hutton, Inc., Nicollet County. (KNK)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-3074 (PJS/TNL). (KNK)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Federated Mutual Insurance Company is a corporate parent of Plaintiff Granite Re, Inc.. (Gregerson, David)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7333615) filed by Granite Re, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gregerson, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Granite Re, Inc. v. Hutton, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Hutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Hutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hutton
Represented By: Brian S McCool
Represented By: Mark W Vyvyan
Represented By: Amanda S Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paulette Hutton
Represented By: Brian S McCool
Represented By: Mark W Vyvyan
Represented By: Amanda S Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Hutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicollet County
Represented By: Roger C Justin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Hutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hutton, Inc.
Represented By: Brian S McCool
Represented By: Mark W Vyvyan
Represented By: Amanda S Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Granite Re, Inc.
Represented By: David H Gregerson
Represented By: Daniel R Gregerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?