Anderson v. Patch Boys Franchising, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Alyssa Anderson
Defendant: Patch Boys Franchising, LLC, Curtis Swanson, Leiby Goldberger and Bill Weber
Case Number: 0:2019cv03119
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Alyssa Anderson (Johnsen, Erin)
January 20, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alyssa Anderson. Patch Boys Franchising, LLC served on 1/2/2020, answer due 1/23/2020. (Johnsen, Erin)
January 20, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alyssa Anderson. Leiby Goldberger served on 1/2/2020, answer due 1/23/2020. (Johnsen, Erin)
January 15, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alyssa Anderson. Curtis Swanson served on 1/7/2020, answer due 1/28/2020. (Johnsen, Erin)
January 13, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alyssa Anderson. Bill Weber served on 12/30/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Johnsen, Erin)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Leiby Goldberger, Patch Boys Franchising, LLC, Curtis Swanson, Bill Weber. (MMG)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-3119 JRT/DTS. (MMG) Modified text on 12/19/2019 (MMG).
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Leiby Goldberger, Patch Boys Franchising, LLC, Curtis Swanson, Bill Weber (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7351031) filed by Alyssa Anderson. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Johnsen, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Patch Boys Franchising, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patch Boys Franchising, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leiby Goldberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa Anderson
Represented By: Erin C. Johnsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?