Brown et al v. Pfeiffer et al
Plaintiff: Shatara Brown, Colleana Young and Nikoe Lee
Defendant: Michael Fruen, Fruen & Pfeiffer LLP, M Fruen Properties LLC and Reese Pfeiffer
Counter Claimant: Fruen & Pfeiffer, LLP
Case Number: 0:2019cv03132
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 3/4/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 2/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(BJP)
February 3, 2020 Filing 50 Amend Pfeiffer & Fruen &Pfeiffer JT ANSWER to Complaint And Fruen & Pfeiffer, COUNTERCLAIM against Shatara Brown. filed by Reese Pfeiffer. (Petricka, LuAnn)
January 31, 2020 Filing 49 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Fruen & Pfeiffer LLP. (Petricka, LuAnn)
January 31, 2020 Filing 48 Pfeiffer & Fruen & Pfeiffer LLP Jt. ANSWER to Complaint And, COUNTERCLAIM of Fruen & Pfeiffer LLP against Shatara Brown. filed by Reese Pfeiffer. (Petricka, LuAnn)
January 29, 2020 Filing 47 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #45 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Michael Fruen.(Skolnick, William)
January 29, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #45 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 4/9/2020 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Skolnick, William)
January 29, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Michael Fruen. (Skolnick, William)
January 29, 2020 Filing 44 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant M Fruen Properties LLC. (Skolnick, William)
January 29, 2020 Filing 43 M Fruen Properties, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint AND, COUNTERCLAIM against Colleana Young. filed by M Fruen Properties LLC. (Skolnick, William)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 1/23/2020. (RJE)
January 17, 2020 Filing 41 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright: Motion Hearing held on 1/17/2020 re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Shatara Brown. (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (RJE)
January 16, 2020 Filing 40 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Telephone Conference held on 1/16/2020. See minutes for details. (BJP)
January 16, 2020 Filing 39 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Telephone Conference held on 1/16/2020. See minutes for details. (BJP)
January 16, 2020 Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Telephone Conference held on 1/16/2020. See minutes for details. (BJP)
January 16, 2020 Filing 37 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Telephone Conference held on 1/16/2020. See minutes for details. (BJP)
January 16, 2020 Filing 36 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: WILL REFILE Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Telephone Conference held on 1/16/2020. See minutes for details. (BJP) Modified text on 1/17/2020 (kt).
January 16, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by LuAnn M Petricka on behalf of Fruen & Pfeiffer LLP, Reese Pfeiffer. (Petricka, LuAnn)
January 15, 2020 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Reese Pfieffer in Opposition to #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Michael Fruen, Fruen & Pfeiffer LLP, M Fruen Properties LLC, Reese Pfeiffer.(Johnson, Samuel)
January 15, 2020 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Michael Fruen, Fruen & Pfeiffer LLP, M Fruen Properties LLC, Reese Pfeiffer. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Johnson, Samuel)
January 15, 2020 Filing 31 (Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS: The Court will hold confidential telephone conferences to discuss settlement with each party and their respective counsel on Thursday, January 16, 2020. Counsel have been assigned their specific times and call-in instructions have been provided. (KAT)
January 15, 2020 Filing 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Status Conference held on 1/15/2020. See Minutes for details. (KAT)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE: Telephone Conference set for 1/15/2020 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Call-in instructions will be emailed to counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 1/15/2020. (KAT)
January 14, 2020 Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Telephone Conference held on 1/14/2020. (KAT)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE: Telephone Conference set for 1/14/2020 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Call-in instructions will be emailed to counsel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 1/14/2020. (KAT)
January 13, 2020 NOTICE - The Court has reviewed the Parties' stipulation #24 . The request is denied and the preliminary-injunction hearing will occur as scheduled. (JTJ)
January 13, 2020 Filing 25 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #24 Stipulation. (Stillman, Rebecca)
January 13, 2020 Filing 24 STIPULATION to Amend Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Shatara Brown, Nikoe Lee, Colleana Young. Jointly signed by Reese Pfeiffer, Fruen & Pfeiffer LLP, Michael Fruen, M. Fruen Properties LLC. (Stillman, Rebecca) Modified text on 1/19/2020 (CLK).
January 13, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by William R Skolnick on behalf of Michael Fruen, M Fruen Properties LLC. (Skolnick, William)
January 7, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Stillman, Rebecca)
January 6, 2020 Filing 21 Summons Issued as to Michael Fruen, Fruen & Pfeiffer LLP, M Fruen Properties LLC, Reese Pfeiffer. (CLK)
January 3, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Shatara Brown, Nikoe Lee, Colleana Young. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Stillman, Rebecca)
January 3, 2020 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Rebecca Stillman re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Shatara Brown . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Z)(Stillman, Rebecca)
January 3, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Shatara Brown. (Stillman, Rebecca)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #1 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs.; granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs.; granting #3 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 1/3/2020. (BJP)
January 2, 2020 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #5 Motion for TRO signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 12/27/2019. RNM)
December 23, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Shatara Brown re #4 Complaint, #8 Declaration in Support, #11 Briefing Order, #9 Proposed Order to Judge - Other, #6 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #7 Declaration in Support, #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested (Stillman, Rebecca)
December 23, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Shatara Brown re #4 Complaint, #8 Declaration in Support, #11 Briefing Order, #9 Proposed Order to Judge - Other, #6 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #7 Declaration in Support, #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested (Stillman, Rebecca)
December 23, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Shatara Brown re #4 Complaint, #8 Declaration in Support, #11 Briefing Order, #9 Proposed Order to Judge - Other, #6 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #7 Declaration in Support, #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested (Stillman, Rebecca)
December 23, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Shatara Brown re #4 Complaint, #8 Declaration in Support, #11 Briefing Order, #9 Proposed Order to Judge - Other, #6 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #7 Declaration in Support, #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested (Stillman, Rebecca)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. (See order for dates and details). Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 12/20/2019. (RJE)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations, ADA Other list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 19-cv-3132 WMW/KMM. (KDS)
December 19, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 Motion for TRO. (Stillman, Rebecca)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 Declaration of Rebecca Stillman in Support of #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Shatara Laquanda Brown, Nikoe Lee, Colleana Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) U - Y)(Stillman, Rebecca)
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 Declaration of Shatara Brown in Support of #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Shatara Laquanda Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - T)(Stillman, Rebecca)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Shatara Laquanda Brown. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Stillman, Rebecca)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Shatara Laquanda Brown. (Stillman, Rebecca)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Shatara Laquanda Brown. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Stillman, Rebecca)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Colleana Young. (Stillman, Rebecca)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Nikoe Lee. (Stillman, Rebecca)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Shatara Laquanda Brown. (Stillman, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Pfeiffer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Fruen
Represented By: Samuel Maddox Johnson
Represented By: William R Skolnick
Represented By: Andrea Skolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fruen & Pfeiffer LLP
Represented By: LuAnn M Petricka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Fruen Properties LLC
Represented By: Samuel Maddox Johnson
Represented By: William R Skolnick
Represented By: Andrea Skolnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reese Pfeiffer
Represented By: LuAnn M Petricka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shatara Brown
Represented By: Justin H Perl
Represented By: Anne M Robertson
Represented By: Rebecca Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleana Young
Represented By: Justin H Perl
Represented By: Anne M Robertson
Represented By: Rebecca Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikoe Lee
Represented By: Justin H Perl
Represented By: Anne M Robertson
Represented By: Rebecca Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Fruen & Pfeiffer, LLP
Represented By: LuAnn M Petricka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?