Villanueva v. Riverside Homes of Minneapolis Limited Partnership et al
Plaintiff: Angela Villanueva
Defendant: Mutual Management Company and Riverside Homes of Minneapolis Limited Partnership
Case Number: 0:2019cv03138
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Angela Villanueva. Mutual Management Company waiver sent on 1/23/2020, answer due 3/23/2020; Riverside Homes of Minneapolis Limited Partnership waiver sent on 1/23/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Zwak, Julia)
January 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF LAWSUIT AND REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service for Defendants Riverside Homes of Minneapolis Limited Partnership and Mutual Management Company. Documents have been mailed to all listed defendants: Order Granting IFP, Complaint, two Waiver of Services (AO 399), and one Prepaid Envelope. Waiver of Service due by 2/24/2020. (kt)
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Order Granting IFP and USM Forms to Complete cc: Counsel with USM forms. (kt) Modified text on 1/3/2020 (kt).
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 12/27/2019. (TMA)
December 21, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations, ADA Other) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-3138 (PAM/ECW). (lmb)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Angela Villanueva. (Zwak, Julia)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Angela Villanueva. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Zwak, Julia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villanueva v. Riverside Homes of Minneapolis Limited Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mutual Management Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverside Homes of Minneapolis Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Villanueva
Represented By: Julia Diane Zwak
Represented By: Rebecca Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?