Boll & Branch LLC v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Boll & Branch LLC
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 0:2019cv03148
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 1/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(BJP)
January 28, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Target Corporation. (Routhier, Peter)
January 16, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Boll & Branch LLC. Target Corporation served on 1/7/2020, answer due 1/28/2020. (Horrell, Holley) Modified text on 1/21/2020 (kt).
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Drew M Hicks for Boll & Branch LLC.; granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael Hurst for Boll & Branch LLC.; granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Stephanie M. Scott for Boll & Branch LLC. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 1/10/2020. (JGK)
January 9, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stephanie M. Scott. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7389220 filed by Boll & Branch LLC. (Horrell, Holley)
January 9, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney J. Michael Hurst. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7389207 filed by Boll & Branch LLC. (Horrell, Holley)
January 9, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Drew M. Hicks. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7389190 filed by Boll & Branch LLC. (Horrell, Holley)
January 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Holley C Horrell on behalf of Boll & Branch LLC. (Horrell, Holley)
December 26, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing J. Michael Hurst, Drew M. Hicks, Stephanie M. Scott as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MTP)
December 26, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Target Corporation. (MTP)
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Copyright & Trademark list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 19-cv-3148 SRN/KMM. (MTP)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Hibbard, Kathryn)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Boll & Branch LLC. (Hibbard, Kathryn)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Target Corporation (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7356754) filed by Boll & Branch LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - H, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hibbard, Kathryn) Modified text on 12/26/2019 (MKB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boll & Branch LLC v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Peter M Routhier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boll & Branch LLC
Represented By: Kathryn N. Hibbard
Represented By: Holley C Horrell
Represented By: Drew M Hicks
Represented By: Michael Hurst
Represented By: Stephanie M. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?