Kruzel v Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Amy Kruzel
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., Cooper Companies, Inc., The, Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc. and Coopersurgical, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv03182
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 41 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Tobias Millrood, Kara D. Hill, Brian Rubenstein, Gregory T. Sturges, Frederick M. Erny as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (kt) cc: Tobias Millrood, Kara D. Hill, Brian Rubenstein, Gregory T. Sturges, Frederick M. Erny. (kt)
December 27, 2019 Filing 40 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-03986. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz and referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois per Sixth Division Master List.
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF DEFENDANTS TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC, COOPERSURGICAL, INC AND THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. TO TRANFER THIS ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF MINNESOTA IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 11/18/19. 11/18/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) Modified on 12/23/2019 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
November 18, 2019 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 11/18/19. 11/18/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF PLAINTIFF'S TO JOIN TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA INC PURSUANT TO RULE 20 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE IS DENIED. THERE IS NO EVIDENCE THAT TEVA USA WAS INTHE CHAIN OF DISTRIBUTION AS A MANUFACTURER OR SELLER OF THE MEDICAL DEVICES IN ISSUE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 11/18/19. 11/18/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
November 15, 2019 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re #32 First MOTION for Joinder Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc Reply in Support of filed by AMY KRUZEL. (HILL, KARA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
November 8, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 First MOTION for Joinder Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc filed by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(ERNY, FREDERICK) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 34 Memorandum Reply in Support re #21 MOTION to Transfer Venue in the Alternative Motion to Dismiss in the Alternative Motion for Judgmeent on the Pleadings filed by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(ERNY, FREDERICK) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Transfer Venue in the Alternative Motion to Dismiss in the Alternative Motion for Judgmeent on the Pleadings filed by AMY KRUZEL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ex.)(HILL, KARA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 32 First MOTION for Joinder Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc filed by AMY KRUZEL.Teva Pharmaceuticals USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh.Pkt, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(HILL, KARA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER THAT THE ORDER DATED 9/27/19 IS VACATED. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE AND SERVE ANY REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTIONS TO TRANSFER VENUE ON OR BEFORE 11/1/19. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 10/15/19. 10/16/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
September 27, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #21 MOTION to Transfer Venue in the Alternative Motion to Dismiss in the Alternative Motion for Judgmeent on the Pleadings. RESPONSES DUE BY 10/25/2019. REPLIES DUE BY 11/1/2019. (amas) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLETE DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM DEFENDANT TEVA WOMAN'S HEALTH, INC. IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE AND SERVE, ON OR BEFORE 10/25/19, RESPONSIVE BRIEFS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C.& 1404 (a); ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 9/27/19. 9/27/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED (mbh) Modified on 10/16/2019 (mbh, ). (VACATED PER ORDER #31) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 29 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Complete Discovery Responses re #27 MOTION to Compel Complete Discovery Responses filed by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLETE DISCOVERY RESPONSES ON OR BEFORE 9/23/19. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 9/9/19. 9/10/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Compel Complete Discovery Responses filed by AMY KRUZEL.Memorandum, Certificate of Good Faith, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Certificate of Good Faith, #3 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Initial Discovery Requests as to Venue, #4 Exhibit B Defendants Initial Discovery Response, #5 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants Deficient Responses, #6 Exhibit D Plaintiffs Joint Letter re: Meet & Confer, #7 Exhibit E - Defendants First Supplemental Response to Discovery)(HILL, KARA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Filing 26 Minute Entry for Conference held on 7/2/19 before Judge Harvey Bartle, III. (mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III. A CONFERENCE NOT ON THE RECORD was held on 7/1/19. (fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER THAT THE ORDER DATED 5/15/19 23 IS VACATED. DEFENDANTS SHALL RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' INTERROGATORIES RELATED TO THE MOTIONS OF DEFENDANTS TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 USC:1404(A) ON OR BEFORE JULY 12, 2019. PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE AN SERVE, ON OR BEFORE JULY 31, 2019, ANY RESPONSIVE BRIEFS IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTIONS OF DEFENDANTS TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 USC:1404(A). DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE AND SERVE, ON OR BEFORE AUGUST 12, 2019, ANY REPLY BRIEFS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTIONS TO TRANSFER VENUE. THE MOTIONS OF DEFENDANTS TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINTS OF PLAINTIFFS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION UNDER RULE 12(B)(2) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS UNDER RULE 12(C) FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ARE STAYED PENDING FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 7/1/19. 7/2/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS SHALL SERVE ON OR BEFORE 5/29/19 INTERROGATORIES RELATED TO THE MOTIONS OF DEFENDANTS TO TRANSFER VENUE. DEFENDANTS SHALL RESPOND TO THE INTERROGATORIES ON OR BEFORE 6/28/19. PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE AND SERVE ON OR BEFORE 7/12/19 ANY RESPONSIVE BRIEFS IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTIONS OF DEFENDANTS TO TRANSFER VENUE. DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE AND SERVE ON OR BEFORE 7/22/19 ANY REPLY BRIEFS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTIONS TO TRANSFER VENUE. MOTIONS OF DEFENDANTS TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINTS OF PLAINTIFFS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION UNDER RULE 12(b)(2) OF THE FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS UNDER RULE 12(c) FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ARE STAYED PENDING FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 5/15/19. 5/16/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED(mbh, ). (ORDER VACATED PURSUANT TO JUDGE BARTLE'S ORDER OF 7/2/19 #24 ) Modified 7/2/19 (fdc). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 22 Minute Entry for Status Conference held on 5/15/19, before Judge Harvey Bartle, III. (mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Transfer Venue in the Alternative Motion to Dismiss in the Alternative Motion for Judgmeent on the Pleadings filed by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE ON OR BEFORE 5/13/19 ANY MOTIONS. A STATUS CONFERENCE SHALL TAKE PLACE IN CHAMBERS ON 5/15/19 AT 2:00 PM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 4/22/19. 4/23/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 19 Minute Entry for Status Conference not on the record was held on 4/22/19, before Judge Harvey Bartle, III. (ti, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/22/2019 10:00 AM IN JUDGE BARTLE'S CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE III.(km, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANTS TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. AND TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC. ARE DISMISSED FROM THE ABOVE AS FRAUDULENTLY JOINED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 3/28/19. 3/28/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by KARA D. HILL on behalf of AMY KRUZEL with Certificate of Service(HILL, KARA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 15 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN RUBENSTEIN on behalf of COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 13 Remark THE STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/16/2018 IS CANCELLED. (km, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by TOBIAS MILLROOD on behalf of AMY KRUZEL with Jury Demand(MILLROOD, TOBIAS) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by FREDERICK M. ERNY on behalf of COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(ERNY, FREDERICK) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/16/2018 09:30 AM IN JUDGE BARTLE'S CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE III. ADDITIONAL CONFERENCE INFORMATION CONTAINED HEREIN.(km, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 9/18/18. 9/18/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Amendment to Notice of Removal to Attach Additional State Court Process, Pleadings and Orders (STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by COOPERSURGICAL, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS INDUSTRIES, LTD. for TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.; Corporate Parent TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. for TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.; Corporate Parent THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. for COOPERSURGICAL, INC.; Corporate Parent TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. for TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC.. by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC..(ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County, case number 180401533. Certicicate of Service.(Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 184812) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(ahf) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 12/27/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kruzel v Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Companies, Inc., The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coopersurgical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Kruzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?