Scher v. Federal Bureau of Prisons et al
Plaintiff: Greg Scher
Defendant: A. Schumacher, V. Mathis, John & Jane Does 1-10, Kathleen Hawk-Sawyer, Federal Bureau of Prisons and John Doe
Case Number: 0:2020cv00016
Filed: January 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER from Clerk's Office re: #7 Letter to the Clerk's Office. (MTP)
January 27, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER TO THE CLERK'S OFFICE by Greg Scher. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MTP) Modified text on 1/27/2020 (MTP). Qc'd on 2/6/2020 (KNK).
January 16, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Greg Scher. (MTP) Document QC'd on 1/28/2020 (JGK).
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER/NOTICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 1/8/2020. (MSK)
January 2, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST TO FAST TRACK PETITION. filed by Greg Scher.(JGK) Document QC'd on 1/7/2020 (JGK).
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Greg Scher by Greg Scher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(JGK) Document QC'd on 1/7/2020 (JGK).
January 2, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Greg Scher. (JGK) Document QC'd on 1/7/2020 (JGK).
January 2, 2020 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau of Prisons, Kathleen Hawk-Sawyer, John & Jane Does 1-10, John Doe, V. Mathis, A. Schumacher filed by Greg Scher. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JGK) Document QC'd on 1/7/2020 (JGK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scher v. Federal Bureau of Prisons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Mathis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John & Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Hawk-Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Scher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?