Faue v. Saul
Plaintiff: Mary Kay Faue
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 0:2020cv00111
Filed: January 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2020 Filing 11 Social Security ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed electronically. (Attachments: #1 Court Transcript Index, #2 Documents Related to Administrative Process, #3 Payment Documents and Decisions, #4 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, #5 Non Disability Related Development, #6 Disability Related Development Part 1, #7 Disability Related Development Part 2, #8 Medical Records Part 1, #9 Medical Records Part 2, #10 Medical Records Part 3, #11 Medical Records Part 4, #12 Medical Records Part 5, #13 Medical Records Part 6, #14 Medical Records Part 7, #15 Medical Records Part 8, #16 Medical Records Part 9, #17 Medical Records Part 10, #18 Medical Records Part 11, #19 Medical Records Part 12, #20 Medical Records Part 13, #21 Medical Records Part 14, #22 Medical Records Part 15, #23 Medical Records Part 16, #24 Medical Records Part 17, #25 Medical Records Part 18, #26 Medical Records Part 19, #27 Medical Records Part 20, #28 Medical Records Part 21, #29 Medical Records Part 22, #30 Medical Records Part 23)(Carillo, Chris)
March 5, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Andrew Saul. (Carillo, Chris)
March 4, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. A notice to withdraw consent has been filed in this case and is now assigned to Senior Judge David S. Doty and Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-111 DSD/KMM. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (MMG)
February 24, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to USA by Mary Kay Faue. Andrew Saul served on 1/15/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. (lmb) Document QC'd on 2/28/2020 (JGK).
February 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Chris Carillo on behalf of Andrew Saul. (Carillo, Chris)
January 14, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. (MMG)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 1/10/2020. (KAT)
January 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES: Social Security Case Assignment Form Issued. Per #Local Rule 7.2, this form must be submitted to the clerk in paper on or before the answer due date. Please mail the completed form to:U.S. District Court for the District of MinnesotaClerks Office300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202Minneapolis, MN 55415 (lmb)
January 9, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez per Social Security List. Please use case number 20-cv-111 (KMM). (lmb)
January 8, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Mary Kay Faue. (Greeman, James)
January 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filed by Mary Kay Faue. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Attachment, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Greeman, James) Modified text on 1/9/2020 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faue v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Chris Carillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Kay Faue
Represented By: James H Greeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?