Armstrong-Morrow v. Cole et al
Plaintiff: Mychael Anthony Armstrong-Morrow
Defendant: Luke DeHaan and Cole
Case Number: 0:2020cv00147
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Filing 5 EXHIBIT Addendum to Complaint re #1 Prisoner Complaint, filed by Mychael Anthony Armstrong-Morrow. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLK) Qc'd on 2/19/2020 (KNK).
February 12, 2020 Filing 4 RECEIPT number 44641106465 in the amount of $53.38 issued to Mychael Armstrong. (CLK) Qc'd on 2/19/2020 (KNK).
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Plaintiff Mychael Anthony Armstrong-Morrow must pay an initial partial filing fee of at least $53.38 within 20 days of the date of this order. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 1/23/2020. (KAT)
January 10, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Mychael Anthony Armstrong-Morrow. (NAH) Qc'd on 1/17/2020 (KNK).
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Cole, Luke DeHaan filed by Mychael Anthony Armstrong-Morrow. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per 6th - Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-6, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (NAH) Qc'd on 1/17/2020 (KNK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armstrong-Morrow v. Cole et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mychael Anthony Armstrong-Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luke DeHaan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?