M.M. v. Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: M.M.
Defendant: Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. and Days Inn Worldwide, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv00227
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Becky R Thorson
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1595
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2020 Filing 16 FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kimberly R. Lambert Adams. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7554406 filed by M.M.. (Kishish, Christ) Modified text on 3/11/2020 (NAH).
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Paul J. Pennock for M.M.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 3/9/2020. (NAH)
March 9, 2020 Filing 14 FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kimberly R. Lambert Adams. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7547570 filed by M.M.. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel)(Kishish, Christ) Modified text on 3/10/2020 (NAH).
March 6, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Paul J. Pennock. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7542311 filed by M.M.. (Kishish, Christ)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Melissa A. Reinckens for Days Inn Worldwide, Inc. and for Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 2/24/2020. (NAH)
February 20, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Melissa A. Reinckens. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7496515 filed by Days Inn Worldwide, Inc., Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.. (Sawers, Michael)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David S Sager for Days Inn Worldwide, Inc. and for Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 2/14/2020. (NAH)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 2/13/2020. (MSK)
February 13, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David S. Sager. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7481659 filed by Days Inn Worldwide, Inc., Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.. (Bundy, Kerry)
February 13, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Bundy, Kerry)
February 13, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Days Inn Worldwide, Inc., Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.. (Bundy, Kerry)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 1/17/2020. (MSK)
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Kimberly L. Adams, Kathryn L. Avila, Teresa A. Curtin as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (CLK)
January 16, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Days Inn Worldwide, Inc., Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. (CLK)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 20-cv-227 ECT/BRT. (CLK)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Days Inn Worldwide, Inc., Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number BMNDC-7405374) filed by M.M.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. Summons and Complaint, #4 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. Summons and Complaint) (Kishish, Christ) Modified text on 1/16/2020 (CLK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.M. v. Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: David S Sager
Represented By: Kerry L Bundy
Represented By: Melissa A. Reinckens
Represented By: Michael M Sawers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Days Inn Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: David S Sager
Represented By: Kerry L Bundy
Represented By: Melissa A. Reinckens
Represented By: Michael M Sawers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.M.
Represented By: Christ J Kishish, II
Represented By: Paul J. Pennock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?