Braun v. Walz et al
Plaintiff: Nathan Christopher Braun
Defendant: Tim Walz, Various MCF-RC Officers, Commissioner of Corrections, Shannon Reiman and MCF-RC Watch Commander
Case Number: 0:2020cv00331
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Prison Authorities re: Filing Fee Due as to Nathan Christopher Braun, enclosing #7 Order to Party File Document/Respond to Court. cc: Prison Authorities, MCF-Rush City. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Order) (lmb)
March 19, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION - DOCUMENT FILED IN INCORRECT CASE - for #8 Order to Party File Document/Respond to Court. (MMP)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR PER DTS CHAMBERS - ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 3/19/2020. (TJB) Modified text on 3/19/2020 (MMP).
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 03/19/2020. (TJB)
March 16, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE re #5 Order to Party File Document/Respond to Court filed by Nathan Christopher Braun. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMP) Document QC'd on 3/20/2020 (JGK).
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 2/25/2020. (TJB)
February 12, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Sarah Beckman, Clemons, Robert Garner, M. Kunze, LaRoche, MCF-RC 3rd Watch Commander, MCF-RC Warden, Olsen, Paul Schnell, Tim Walz, filed by Nathan Christopher Braun. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (lmb) Qc'd on 2/19/2020 (KNK).
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Nathan Christopher Braun. (JGK) Qc'd on 1/27/2020 (KNK).
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Nathan Christopher Braun. (JGK) Qc'd on 1/27/2020 (KNK).
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Corrections, MCF-RC Watch Commander, Shannon Reiman, Various MCF-RC Officers, Tim Walz filed by Nathan Christopher Braun. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JGK) Qc'd on 1/27/2020 (KNK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braun v. Walz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Christopher Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Various MCF-RC Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Reiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCF-RC Watch Commander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?