Best Academy et al v. Hanover Insurance Group, Inc., The et al
Plaintiff: Harvest Preparatory Charter School, Inc., Best Academy and Mastery School, Inc.
Defendant: The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc., Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company and Hanover Insurance Group, Inc., The
Case Number: 0:2020cv00362
Filed: January 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 3/27/2020. (TMA)
March 27, 2020 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #15 Stipulation. (Sharma, Aalok)
March 27, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION For Protective Order by Best Academy. Jointly Signed by Mastery School, Inc., The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc., and Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. (Sharma, Aalok)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER/NOTICE: Confidential Letter to Court due by 3/30/2021. Settlement Conference set for 4/6/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 3/13/2020. (TMA)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 4/6/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Amended Pleadings due by 4/3/2020. Fact Discovery due by 9/11/2020. Expert Discovery due by 12/31/2020. Motions (non-disp) due 9/25/2020. Motions (disp) due by 2/26/2021. Ready for trial due by 6/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 3/13/2020. (TMA)
March 12, 2020 Filing 12 (Text-Only) NOTICE of Cancelation of Hearing: The Pretrial Conference scheduled for 3/12/2020 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright is CANCELLED. A Scheduling Order will be issued. (TMA)
March 5, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Best Academy. Jointly Signed by Mastery School, Inc., The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc., and Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company.(Sharma, Aalok)
February 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J Linnerooth on behalf of Mastery School, Inc.. (Linnerooth, Brian)
February 27, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Mastery School, Inc.. (Hardwick, Kyle)
February 26, 2020 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Best Academy. (Sharma, Aalok)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER/NOTICE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/5/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 3/12/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 2/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TMA)
February 3, 2020 Filing 6 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint filed by Hanover Insurance Group, Inc., The, Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. (Wiegert, Joel)
January 28, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company, The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc. re #3 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Wiegert, Joel)
January 28, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd/4th Civil Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 20-cv-362 DSD/ECW. (KDS)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. The Hanover Insurance Company is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Defendant Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. (Wiegert, Joel)
January 27, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc.. (Wiegert, Joel)
January 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County, Fourth Judicial District, case number 27-CV-20-22 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7433326) filed by The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc., Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Affidavit of Service) (Wiegert, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Best Academy et al v. Hanover Insurance Group, Inc., The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvest Preparatory Charter School, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Best Academy
Represented By: Stephen E Schemenauer
Represented By: Aalok Kumar Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mastery School, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle R Hardwick
Represented By: Brian J Linnerooth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hanover Insurance Group, Inc.
Represented By: Joel T Wiegert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Bay Insurance Company
Represented By: Joel T Wiegert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanover Insurance Group, Inc., The
Represented By: Joel T Wiegert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?