Favors v. Mike et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Anthony Favors
Defendant: Nancy Johnston, Kristi Mike, Jody Harpstead, Michelle Sexe, Heidi Menard, Sonja Walker and Gary Tallofson
Case Number: 0:2020cv00365
Filed: January 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Deadline: 3/20/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 3/2/2020. (TJB) Modified text on 3/3/2020 (SMD).
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jody Harpstead, Nancy Johnston, Heidi Menard, Kristi Mike, Michelle Sexe, Gary Tallofson, Sonja Walker filed by Joseph Anthony Favors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Cover Letter, #14 Affidavit of Service, #15 Envelope) (kt) Document QC'd on 3/4/2020 (JGK).
January 28, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Joseph Anthony Favors. (NAH) Document QC'd on 2/12/2020 (NAH).
January 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jody Harpstead, Nancy Johnston, Heidi Menard, Kristi Mike, Michelle Sexe, Gary Tallofson, Sonja Walker filed by Joseph Anthony Favors. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson and referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service and Certificate of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (NAH) Document QC'd on 2/12/2020 (NAH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Favors v. Mike et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi Mike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jody Harpstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Sexe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Menard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonja Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Tallofson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Anthony Favors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?