Martin v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Paul David-Terence Martin
Respondent: Chad Wolf, William Barr, Michael Albence, Peter Berg and Kurt Freitag
Case Number: 0:2020cv00546
Filed: February 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: John R Tunheim
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Mail Returned as Undeliverable: "Attempted - not known." Order #8 not re-sent to Paul David-Terence Martin. Unable to locate through BOP, DOC, and ICE inmate/detainee locator. (MTP)
March 30, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Albence, William Barr, Peter Berg, Chad Wolf re #9 Response, #10 Declaration (Fuller, David)
March 30, 2020 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Justin Nimmo re #9 Response by Michael Albence, William Barr, Peter Berg, Chad Wolf . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fuller, David)
March 30, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Michael Albence, William Barr, Peter Berg, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Fuller, David)
March 19, 2020 Mail Returned as Undeliverable: "Attempted - not known." Order #8 re-sent to Paul David-Terence Martin with alien detainee number added to address. (CLK)Document QC'd on 4/3/2020 (MMG).
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER in Response to #5 Request.The Federal Respondents shall have until and including March 30, 2020 to respond to the Petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 3/11/2020. (TMA)
March 10, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Albence, William Barr, Peter Berg, Chad Wolf re #5 Request, #6 Proposed Order to Judge - Other (Fuller, David)
March 10, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Request for Extension #5 Request. (Fuller, David)
March 10, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST for Extension by Michael Albence, William Barr, Peter Berg, Chad Wolf. (Fuller, David)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David W Fuller on behalf of Michael Albence, William Barr, Peter Berg, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fuller, David)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Defendant(s)/Respondent(s) to file answer within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 2/19/2020. (TMA)
February 18, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Paul David-Terence Martin. (NAH)
February 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Paul David-Terence Martin. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (NAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: David W Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: David W Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Albence
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: David W Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Peter Berg
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: David W Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kurt Freitag
Represented By: David John Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Paul David-Terence Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?