Krauss et al v. Soo Line Railroad Company et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Krauss and Philip Krauss
Defendant: Soo Line Railroad Company d/b/a Canadian Pacific Railway, National Railroad Passenger Corporation (AMTRAK), Soo Line Railroad Company and National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Case Number: 0:2020cv00566
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Becky R Thorson
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2020 Filing 16 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Hennepin County District Court; enclosing Order of Remand #15 . cc: Hennepin County District Court. (CLK)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER on #12 Stipulation to Remand to State Court. It is ORDERED that this action is REMANDED to Hennepin County District Court. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 3/17/2020. (RMM)
March 15, 2020 Filing 14 (Text-Only) NOTICE of Cancelation of Hearing: Due to the pending motion, there is good cause to delay the pretrial conference set for 04/01/2020. The pretrial conference may be reset to a future date. (MSK)
March 12, 2020 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #12 Stipulation. (Miller, Lee)
March 12, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Remand to State Court by National Railroad Passenger Corporation. Jointly Signed by Philip Krauss, Kimberly Krauss, and National Railroad Passenger Corporation d/b/a Amtrak. (Miller, Lee)
March 5, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court in Hennepin County, Minnesota, filed by Kimberly Krauss, Philip Krauss.(Magnuson, John)
March 5, 2020 Filing 10 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #6 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Kimberly Krauss, Philip Krauss.(Magnuson, John)
March 5, 2020 Filing 9 First AFFIDAVIT of John D. Magnuson in SUPPORT OF #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court in Hennepin County, Minnesota, filed by Kimberly Krauss, Philip Krauss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A - Remand Order, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B - Mediation Correspondence, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C - State Court Removal Documents, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit D - Removal Correspondence)(Magnuson, John)
March 5, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court in Hennepin County, Minnesota, filed by Kimberly Krauss, Philip Krauss. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Magnuson, John)
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court in Hennepin County, Minnesota, : Motion Hearing set for 4/20/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Judge Eric C. Tostrud. (Magnuson, John)
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court in Hennepin County, Minnesota, filed by Kimberly Krauss, Philip Krauss. (Magnuson, John)
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David L Tomenes on behalf of Kimberly Krauss, Philip Krauss. (Tomenes, David)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 4/1/2020 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 2/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK)
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of William H. Herrmann re #1 Notice of Removal,, byNational Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Miller, Lee)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 20-cv-00566 ECT/BRT. (MTP)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court, case number 27-CV-19-9391 (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-7498872) filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation (AMTRAK). No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Amended Summons and Complaint, DOCUMENT/AFFIDAVIT FILED IN ERROR-DIRECTED TO REFILE AS SEPARATE EVENT -#2 Affidavit of William H. Hermann, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (Miller, Lee) Modified text on 2/21/2020 (MTP). Modified text on 2/21/2020 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krauss et al v. Soo Line Railroad Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Krauss
Represented By: David L Tomenes
Represented By: William G Jungbauer
Represented By: John D Magnuson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Krauss
Represented By: David L Tomenes
Represented By: William G Jungbauer
Represented By: John D Magnuson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soo Line Railroad Company d/b/a Canadian Pacific Railway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation (AMTRAK)
Represented By: Lee A Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soo Line Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Lee A Miller
Represented By: Timothy J Carrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?