Landmark Investment Holding Company, LLC v. Macro, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Landmark Infrastructure Holding Company, LLC
Defendant: Michael L. Anderson, Jared, LLP and Macro, LLC
Case Number: 0:2020cv00575
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Landmark Infrastructure Holding Company, LLC. Macro, LLC waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020. (Taylor, D)
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Landmark Infrastructure Holding Company, LLC. Jared, LLP waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020. (Taylor, D)
April 13, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Landmark Infrastructure Holding Company, LLC. Michael L. Anderson waiver sent on 3/10/2020, answer due 5/11/2020. (Taylor, D)
April 11, 2020 Filing 6 FILED IN ERROR. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, Stipulation regarding waiver of service and Defendants' time to respond to Complaint Acknowledgement filed by Landmark Infrastructure Holding Company, LLC. (Taylor, D) Modified text on 4/13/2020 (KDS).
February 24, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Michael L. Anderson, Jared, LLP, Macro, LLC. (kt)
February 24, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 20-cv-575 DSD/ECW. (kt)
February 24, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Daniel R. Luppino as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (kt)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 EXHIBIT Civil Coversheet re #1 Complaint, filed by Landmark Infrastructure Holding Company, LLC. (Taylor, D)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Landmark Investment Holding Company, LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7501551) filed by Landmark Investment Holding Company, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B) (Taylor, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landmark Investment Holding Company, LLC v. Macro, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macro, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landmark Infrastructure Holding Company, LLC
Represented By: D Clay Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?