Ionlake, LLC v. Girard
Plaintiff: ionlake, llc
Defendant: Wade A Girard and Derrick Girard
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Wade A. Girard
Case Number: 0:2020cv00640
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER on #46 Stipulation for Order Unsealing Documents Filed Under Temporary Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 4/28/2020.(MSK)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 4/28/2020.(MSK)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2020 at 01:00 PM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 4/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK)
April 23, 2020 Filing 47 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #46 Stipulation,,. (Cameron, John)
April 23, 2020 Filing 46 STIPULATION re #22 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #1 Complaint, #9 Sealed Proposed Order to Judge - Other, #24 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #6 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #20 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #21 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #7 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #25 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #8 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #26 Proposed Order to Judge, #19 Reply to Response to Motion, #5 Notice of Hearing on Motion FOR ORDER UNSEALING DOCUMENTS FILED UNDER TEMPORARY SEAL by Ionlake, LLC. Jointly Signed by Wade A. Girard and Derrick Girard. (Cameron, John)
April 23, 2020 Filing 45 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #44 Stipulation. (Cameron, John)
April 23, 2020 Filing 44 STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Ionlake, LLC. Jointly Signed by Wade A. Girard and Derrick Girard. (Cameron, John)
April 23, 2020 Filing 43 REPORT Rule 26(f) by Ionlake, LLC. (Cameron, John)
April 20, 2020 Filing 42 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Derrick Girard. (Barth, Schaan)
April 16, 2020 Filing 41 REPLY to Counterclaim filed by Ionlake, LLC. (Cameron, John)
April 15, 2020 Filing 40 Derrick Girard's ANSWER to Third Party Complaint of Wade Girard, COUNTERCLAIM of Derrick Girard against Wade A. Girard. filed by Derrick Girard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - E, #2 Exhibit(s) F - N) (Rooney, Patrick)
April 3, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Schaan Barth on behalf of Derrick Girard. (Barth, Schaan)
April 3, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J Rooney on behalf of Derrick Girard. (Rooney, Patrick)
April 3, 2020 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Wade A. Girard. Derrick Girard waiver sent on 4/2/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (Shiff, Sean)
April 3, 2020 Filing 36 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Derrick Girard., COUNTERCLAIM against Ionlake, LLC. filed by Wade A. Girard. (Shiff, Sean)
April 2, 2020 Filing 35 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Telephone Status Conference held on 4/2/2020. (MSK)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER on #31 Stipulation re: Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 3/23/2020. (SMD)
March 20, 2020 Filing 32 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #31 Stipulation. (Cameron, John)
March 20, 2020 Filing 31 STIPULATION re #5 Notice of Hearing on Motion by Ionlake, LLC. Jointly Signed by Wade A. Girard. (Cameron, John)
March 20, 2020 Filing 30 JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re #22 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #6 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #20 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #21 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #7 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #8 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, #19 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Ionlake, LLC. (Cameron, John)
March 18, 2020 Filing 29 (Text-Only) NOTICE of Cancelation of Hearing: The Court has been notified that the parties have reached an agreement on #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, and a hearing is no longer needed. Therefore, the teleconference set for 9:30 a.m. on 3/18/2020 is CANCELED. (SMD)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ONLY ORDER striking #23 Motion. The sealed motion at Doc. No. 23 is hereby stricken. The parties must follow the procedures set forth in Local Rule 5.6(d) for documents filed under temporary seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 3/17/2020. (MSK)
March 17, 2020 Filing 27 (Text-Only) NOTICE of Resetting of Hearing: Oral arguments on #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order will now be heard by telephone conference before Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 3/18/2020 at 9:30 AM. Counsel have been sent dial-in instructions. (SMD)
March 16, 2020 Filing 26 SEALED PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #23 MOTION Documents to remain confidential. filed by ionlake, llc.(Cameron, John)
March 16, 2020 Filing 25 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 MOTION Documents to remain confidential. filed by ionlake, llc. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Certificate of Compliance)(Cameron, John)
March 16, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #23 MOTION Documents to remain confidential. : Date and time to be determined. (Cameron, John)
March 16, 2020 Filing 23 STRICKEN PER 28 TEXT ONLY ORDER ON 3/17/20 - SEALED MOTION Documents to remain confidential. filed by ionlake, llc. (Cameron, John) Modified text on 3/18/2020 (MMP).
March 16, 2020 Filing 22 SEALED AFFIDAVIT of Mark Bunkowske in SUPPORT OF #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by ionlake, llc.(Cameron, John)
March 16, 2020 Filing 21 SEALED AFFIDAVIT of Derrick Girard in SUPPORT OF #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by ionlake, llc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit G)(Cameron, John)
March 16, 2020 Filing 20 SEALED AFFIDAVIT of J. Matthew Berner in SUPPORT OF #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by ionlake, llc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit D)(Cameron, John)
March 16, 2020 Filing 19 SEALED Reply to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by ionlake, llc. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Cameron, John)
March 16, 2020 Filing 18 (Text-Only) NOTICE to counsel: The District of Minnesota, in recognition of efforts locally and nationally to protect persons from unnecessary potential exposure to COVID-19, is seeking to limit the need for counsel and parties to travel to the courthouse. Accordingly, counsel may choose to appear for the hearing scheduled in this case on March 18, 2020 by telephone. Please inform chambers by Noon on March 17, 2020 whether you wish to appear in person or remotely. (SMD)
March 11, 2020 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Wade A. Girard in OPPOSITION TO #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Wade A. Girard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit(s) Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit(s) Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit(s) Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit(s) Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit(s) Exhibit K)(Shiff, Sean)
March 11, 2020 Filing 16 FILED IN ERROR - WILL BE REFILED. AFFIDAVIT of Wade A. Girard in OPPOSITION TO #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Wade A. Girard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit(s) Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit(s) Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit(s) Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit(s) Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit(s) Exhibit K)(Shiff, Sean) Modified text on 3/11/2020 (KDS).
March 11, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Wade A. Girard. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Certificate of Compliance)(Shiff, Sean)
March 11, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean A Shiff on behalf of Wade A. Girard. (Shiff, Sean)
March 4, 2020 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Ionlake, LLC re #11 Briefing Order,, (Cameron, John)
March 4, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Ionlake, LLC re #11 Briefing Order,, (Cameron, John)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 BRIEFING ORDER re: #4 Sealed Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Response due by 3/11/2020. Reply due by 3/16/2020. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2020 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. Because Defendant's counsel has yet to make an appearance in this matter, Plaintiff is required to serve them immediately with a copy of this Order and to file a certificate of service once the service is complete. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 3/3/2020. (SMD)
March 4, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ionlake, LLC. Wade A. Girard served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (Cameron, John)
March 3, 2020 Filing 9 SEALED PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #6 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #7 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #8 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #4 Sealed Motion, #5 Notice of Hearing on Motion by Ionlake, LLC. (Cameron, John)
March 3, 2020 Filing 8 SEALED AFFIDAVIT of J. Matthew Berner in SUPPORT OF #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Ionlake, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Exhibit A, #2 Sealed Exhibit B, #3 Sealed Exhibit C, #4 Sealed Exhibit D)(Cameron, John)
March 3, 2020 Filing 7 SEALED AFFIDAVIT of Derrick Girard in SUPPORT OF #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Ionlake, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Exhibit A, #2 Sealed Exhibit B, #3 Sealed Exhibit C, #4 Sealed Exhibit D)(Cameron, John) Modified text on 3/3/2020 (lmb).
March 3, 2020 Filing 6 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Ionlake, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Cameron, John) Modified text on 3/3/2020 (lmb).
March 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order: Date and time to be determined. (Cameron, John) Modified text on 3/3/2020 (lmb).
March 3, 2020 Filing 4 SEALED MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Ionlake, LLC. (Cameron, John) Modified text on 3/3/2020 (lmb).
March 3, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Wade A. Girard. (MKB)
March 3, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Copyright/Trademark) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 20-cv-640 (SRN/BRT). (MKB)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 SEALED COMPLAINT against Wade A Girard (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7528305) filed by Ionlake, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cameron, John) Modified text on 3/3/2020 (MKB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ionlake, LLC v. Girard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ionlake, llc
Represented By: John F Cameron
Represented By: J Matthew Berner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wade A Girard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derrick Girard
Represented By: Schaan Barth
Represented By: Patrick J Rooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Wade A. Girard
Represented By: Peter C Brehm
Represented By: Sean A Shiff
Represented By: Steven E Ness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?