Maddox III v. Sather et al
Plaintiff: Harry Maddox III
Defendant: Sara Johnson, John Grey, Ebenezer Tope Adebara, SGT. Lucas Anderson, Jacob Devermeyer, Josh Sather, Matthew J. Meslean, Sandi Lehman, Michael Eichler, Tracy Armistead, Hon. Judge Suzanne Bollman, Kathleen E. Karnowski, SGT. Richard Benson and Gunnar Erickson
Case Number: 0:2020cv00645
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail #8 has already been resent to Harry Maddox III at updated address (Sherburne County). (kt) . Paper QC'd on 4/17/2020 (MTP).
April 6, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Harry Maddox III. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kt) Document QC'd on 4/8/2020 (MMG).
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT re #1 Prisoner Complaint, #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs, #4 Request to Add Defendants, #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Harry Maddox III. See the order for details. Maddox should submit his amended complaint no later than April 20, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 3/26/2020. (JMK)
March 26, 2020 Filing 6 EXHIBIT re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Harry Maddox III.(MMG) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 3/27/2020. (kt)
March 26, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Harry Maddox III. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMG) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 3/27/2020. (kt)
March 23, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST to Add Additional Defendants to Original Complaint, 2nd Amended Complaint, with Statement of Claims, filed by Harry Maddox III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-A, 1-B, 2-B, 3-B, #2 Envelope). (lmb) Document QC'd on 3/31/2020 (JGK).
March 5, 2020 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 EXHIBIT 6-X Placeholder re #1 Prisoner Complaint filed by Harry Maddox III. (KNK) Modified file date (KNK).
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Harry Maddox III. (NAH) Document QC'd on 3/20/2020 (JGK).
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Ebenezer Tope Adebara, Tracy Armistead, Jacob Devermeyer, Michael Eichler, Gunnar Erickson, John Grey, Hon. Judge Suzanne Bollman, Sara Johnson, Kathleen E. Karnowski, Sandi Lehman, Matthew J. Meslean, SGT. Lucas Anderson, SGT. Richard Benson, Josh Sather filed by Harry Maddox III. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-11, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (NAH) Document QC'd on 3/20/2020 (JGK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maddox III v. Sather et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Grey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ebenezer Tope Adebara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT. Lucas Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Devermeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Sather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew J. Meslean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandi Lehman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Eichler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Armistead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. Judge Suzanne Bollman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen E. Karnowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT. Richard Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gunnar Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Maddox III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?