Perkins v. Ring
Plaintiff: Victor B. Perkins
Defendant: Ms. M. Ring
Case Number: 0:2020cv00673
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Prisoner Complaint, filed by Victor B. Perkins; #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Victor B. Perkins; #4 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Victor B. Perkins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 4/6/2020. (KAT)
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER TO PLAINTIFF, CC: DISTRICT JUDGE by M. Ring (Rule 4 Letter). (Voss, Ana) Modified text on 4/7/2020 (JME).
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ana H Voss on behalf of M. Ring. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Voss, Ana)
March 19, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE TO THE LACK OF MATERIAL FACTS IN DEFENSE OF COMPLAINT AND MOTION PURSUANT TO RULES 12(a)(1) and 56(c) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE filed by Victor B. Perkins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLK) Qc'd on 3/25/2020 (KNK).
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE: AGREEMENT FOR SETTLEMENT by Victor B. Perkins (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLK) Document QC'd on 3/20/2020 (JGK).
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Victor B. Perkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Inmate Inquiry)(JGK) Document QC'd on 3/20/2020 (JGK).
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against M. Ring filed by Victor B. Perkins. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Kate M. Menendez. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope) (JGK) Document QC'd on 3/20/2020 (JGK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perkins v. Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor B. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. M. Ring
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?