Price v. Saul
Plaintiff: Jason P. Price
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 0:2020cv00688
Filed: March 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:0405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER REFERRING Litigant to FBA Pro Se Project from Magistrate Judge Leung. (HAM)
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. (kt)
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER REFERRING Litigant to FBA Pro Se Project from Magistrate Judge Leung.(HAM)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/6/2020. (HAM)
March 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES: Social Security Case Assignment Form Issued. Per #Local Rule 7.2, this form must be submitted to the clerk in paper on or before the answer due date. Please mail the completed form to:U.S. District Court for the District of MinnesotaClerks Office300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202Minneapolis, MN 55415 (JGK)
March 6, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Jason P. Price. (JGK) Document QC'd by JME. Modified text on 3/24/2020 (JME).
March 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filed by Jason P. Price. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Tony N. Leung per Social Security List list. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (JGK) Document QC'd by JME. Modified text on 3/24/2020 (JME).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason P. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?