CVF III Mortgage Loan Trust II v. Kuehne et al
Plaintiff: CVF III Mortgage Loan Trust II
Defendant: Mary Rowe and John DOE
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Stephen W. Kuehne and Ann L. Kuehne
3Rd Party Defendant: NewRez LLC
Case Number: 0:2020cv00713
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 2609
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER/NOTICE: ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Confidential Letter to Court due by 12/8/2020. Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 12/1/2020. Settlement Conference set for 12/11/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 5/4/2020.(MSK)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER/NOTICE: PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 9/15/2020. Fact Discovery due by 12/18/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 9/15/2020. Motions (non-disp) due 12/18/2020. Motions (disp) due by 2/26/2021. Ready for trial due by 6/28/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 5/4/2020.(MSK)
May 1, 2020 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/1/2020. (MSK)
April 28, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Ann L. Kuehne, Stephen W. Kuehne. Jointly Signed by CVF III Mortgage Loan Trust II and NewRez LLC, d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing.(Kauf, Karly)
April 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Matthew Rossman on behalf of NewRez LLC. (Rossman, Joseph)
April 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for CVF III Mortgage Loan Trust II. (Rossman, Joseph)
April 13, 2020 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Karly A. Kauf re #5 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Ann L. Kuehne, Stephen W. Kuehne . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 4)(Kauf, Karly)
April 13, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against NewRez LLC, d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing., COUNTERCLAIM against CVF III Mortgage Loan Trust II. filed by Ann L. Kuehne, Stephen W. Kuehne. (Kauf, Karly)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 5/1/2020 at 11:00 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 3/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Karly A. Kauf re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Stephen W. Kuehne . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2)(Kauf, Karly)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 20-cv-713 DSD/BRT. (CLK)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dakota County District Court, case number 19WS-CV-20-233 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7557923) filed by Stephen W. Kuehne. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. DIRECTED TO REFILE. Supplement Declaration of Karly A. Kauf in Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal of Civil Action, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kauf, Karly) Modified text on 3/12/2020 (CLK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CVF III Mortgage Loan Trust II v. Kuehne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CVF III Mortgage Loan Trust II
Represented By: Orin J Kipp
Represented By: Joseph Matthew Rossman
Represented By: Melissa L.B. Porter
Represented By: Michael R Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Stephen W. Kuehne
Represented By: Karly A. Kauf
Represented By: Anthony T Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Ann L. Kuehne
Represented By: Karly A. Kauf
Represented By: Anthony T Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: NewRez LLC
Represented By: Joseph Matthew Rossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?