VanDenBloom et al v. Arlone Township
Plaintiff: Bruce VanDenBoom and Linda VanDenBoom
Defendant: Arlone Township
Case Number: 0:2020cv00718
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/31/2020. Fact Discovery due by 12/31/2020. Expert Discovery due by 12/31/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 7/31/2020. Motions (non-disp) due 1/31/2021. Motions (disp) due by 2/28/2021. Ready for trial due by 6/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 4/22/2020.(JLB)
April 16, 2020 Filing 10 STATEMENT OF CASE as to Arlone Township. (Alsop, Robert)
April 16, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Arlone Township. Jointly Signed by Bruce VanDenBoom and Linda VanDenBoom.(Alsop, Robert)
April 16, 2020 Filing 8 STATEMENT OF CASE as to All Plaintiffs. (Anderson, Matthew)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER WHILE DISTRICT OF MINNESOTA IS UNDER GENERAL ORDER RELATED TO COVID-19: See Notice and Order for document submission deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 3/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JLB)
March 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew E Anderson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Anderson, Matthew)
March 16, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Arlone Township (Alsop, Robert)
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Joshua P. Devaney as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MKB) cc: Devaney. Modified text on 3/13/2020 (MKB).
March 12, 2020 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Steven Anderson as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MKB) cc: Anderson. Modified text on 3/13/2020 (MKB).
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (5th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 20-cv-718 (WMW/LIB). (MKB)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pine County District Court, case number 58-CV-20-92 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7558998) filed by Arlone Township. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Alsop, Robert) Modified text on 3/12/2020 (MKB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VanDenBloom et al v. Arlone Township
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce VanDenBoom
Represented By: Matthew E Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda VanDenBoom
Represented By: Matthew E Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlone Township
Represented By: Robert A Alsop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?