Halverson Wood Products, Inc. v. Classified Systems LLC
Plaintiff: Halverson Wood Products, Inc.
Defendant: Classified Systems LLC
Case Number: 0:2020cv00801
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Classified Systems LLC. (Beard, R.)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney R. William Beard, Jr for Classified Systems LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 5/20/2020. (NAH)
May 19, 2020 Filing 14 (Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY regarding Dispositive Motions briefing schedule: All dispositive motions must comply with Local Rule 7.1(c). Responses to dispositive motions shall be filed with the Court on or before 21 days after the service of the supporting memorandum to the original motion. Replies to responsive briefs shall be filed 14 days after the service of the response to the dispositive motion. Upon the motion being fully briefed and filed, counsel for the moving party shall email Chief Judge Tunheims chambers at Tunheim_Chambers@mnd.uscourts.gov to request a hearing date. Upon receiving from Chief Judge Tunheims Courtroom Deputy a hearing date, time and location, the moving party shall file the amended notice of hearing at that time. Replies due by 6/15/2020. Responses due by 6/1/2020. (HAZ)
May 18, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General with Signed Compliance Certificate filed by Classified Systems LLC.(Uradnik, Joseph)
May 18, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING re #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Classified Systems LLC. Date and time to be determined. (Uradnik, Joseph) Modified text on 5/19/2020 (CLK).
May 18, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Classified Systems LLC.(Uradnik, Joseph)
May 18, 2020 Filing 10 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #8 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Classified Systems LLC.(Uradnik, Joseph)
May 18, 2020 Filing 9 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. REFILED AT 13. MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Classified Systems LLC.(Uradnik, Joseph) Modified text on 5/19/2020 (CLK).
May 18, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Classified Systems LLC. (Uradnik, Joseph)
May 18, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney R. William Beard Jr. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7729626 filed by Classified Systems LLC. (Uradnik, Joseph)
April 28, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Halverson Wood Products, Inc.. Classified Systems LLC served on 4/25/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. (DuFault, Dustin)
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Classified Systems LLC. (MMG)
April 21, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Request to Clerk's Office to Issue Summons for Classified Systems LLC. (DuFault, Dustin)
March 25, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (DuFault, Dustin)
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge, John R. Tunheim per 5th Patent list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 20-cv-801 (JRT/LIB). (MMP)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Classified Systems LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7591323) filed by Halverson Wood Products, Inc. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (DuFault, Dustin) Modified text on 3/25/2020 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halverson Wood Products, Inc. v. Classified Systems LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Classified Systems LLC
Represented By: Joseph A Uradnik
Represented By: R. William Beard, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Halverson Wood Products, Inc.
Represented By: Dustin R DuFault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?