Sto SE & Co. KGaA et al v. NaturaSeal Distribution, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sto SE & Co. KGaA and Sto Corp., Sto Corp. and Sto SE & Co. KGaA
Defendant: NaturaSeal Distribution, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv00826
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Sto SE & Co. KGaA. (Rosen, Daniel)
March 31, 2020 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Sto Corp. is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Sto SE & Co. KGaA. (Rosen, Daniel) Modified text on 4/1/2020 (MMP).
March 30, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to NaturaSeal Distribution, Inc.. (kt)
March 30, 2020 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Trademark list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 20-cv-826 JRT/DTS. (kt)
March 30, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint, filed by Sto SE & Co. KGaA, Sto Corp. (Rosen, Daniel) Modified text on 3/31/2020 (lmb).
March 27, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Rosen, Daniel)
March 27, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURES Corporate Disclosure of Sto SE & Co. KGaA by Sto SE & Co. KGaA and Sto Corp..(Rosen, Daniel)
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURES Corporate Disclosure of Sto Corp. by Sto SE & Co. KGaA and Sto Corp..(Rosen, Daniel)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NaturaSeal Distribution, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7599172) filed by Sto SE & Co. KGaA and Sto Corp.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Rosen, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sto SE & Co. KGaA et al v. NaturaSeal Distribution, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NaturaSeal Distribution, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sto SE & Co. KGaA and Sto Corp.
Represented By: Daniel N Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sto Corp.
Represented By: Daniel N Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sto SE & Co. KGaA
Represented By: Daniel N Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?