Kunzer v. Hiniker et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth R. Kunzer
Defendant: Meier, Kennedy and Quinn, Chartered, Lisa A. Hiniker, U.S. Bank, Robins Kaplan LLP, Esq. Charles M. Bichler, Lawgix Lawyers, LLC, Esq. Michael D. Johnson, Esq. Denise Suzanne Rahne, Esq. John C. Gunderson and Esq. Ena M. Kovacevic
Case Number: 0:2020cv00882
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #10 MOTION to Vacate Order filed by Kenneth R. Kunzer, #1 Complaint filed by Kenneth R. Kunzer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 6/3/2020.(KAT)
May 28, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard B Allyn on behalf of Ena M. Kovacevic, Denise Suzanne Rahne, Robins Kaplan LLP. (Allyn, Richard)
May 13, 2020 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 MOTION to Vacate Order filed by Kenneth R. Kunzer.(Kunzer, Kenneth)
May 13, 2020 Filing 13 First AFFIDAVIT of Kenneth R. Kunzer in SUPPORT OF #10 MOTION to Vacate Order of October 13, 2003 filed by Kenneth R. Kunzer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Kunzer, Kenneth)
May 13, 2020 Filing 12 LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE re #10 MOTION and MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION to Vacate Order filed by Kenneth R. Kunzer.(Kunzer, Kenneth) Modified text on 5/13/2020 (CLK).
May 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #10 MOTION to Vacate Order : Date and time to be determined. (Kunzer, Kenneth)
May 13, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION to Vacate Order filed by Kenneth R. Kunzer. (Kunzer, Kenneth) Modified text on 5/13/2020 (CLK).
May 12, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER TO THE COURT REGARDING SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT AND REGARDING #10 MOTION TO VACATE from Kenneth R. Kunzer, Plaintiff. (Kunzer, Kenneth) Modified text on 5/13/2020 (CLK).
May 11, 2020 Filing 8 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. DIRECTED TO REFILE. MOTION to Vacate Order filed by Kenneth R. Kunzer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Kunzer, Kenneth) Modified text on 5/12/2020 (CLK).
May 8, 2020 Filing 7 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. DIRECTED TO REFILE. MOTION to Vacate Order filed by Kenneth R. Kunzer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Kunzer, Kenneth) Modified text on 5/11/2020 (CLK).
May 8, 2020 Filing 6 Clerk's Notice of APPLICATION FOR PRO SE LITIGANT TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY. Kenneth Kunzer is GRANTED e-filing privileges in this case. Pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 5 and 7(d), Kenneth Kunzer has consented to electronic service and has agreed to waive service by other means for all subsequent filings in this case, except when electronic service is not allowed under the rules. (JGK)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #4 Motion to Disqualify District Judge(Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 4/27/2020. (BJP)
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Remove District Judge filed by Kenneth R. Kunzer. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Envelope)(KDS) Document QC'd on 4/29/2020 (CLK).
April 17, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kenneth R. Kunzer as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(kt) DOCUMENT QC'd by LJG on 4/21/2020 (LJG).
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Charles M. Bichler, John C. Gunderson, Lisa A. Hiniker, Michael D. Johnson, Ena M. Kovacevic, Lawgix Lawyers, LLC, Meier, Kennedy and Quinn, Chartered, Denise Suzanne Rahne, Robins Kaplan LLP, U.S. Bank. (JGK) cc: Kunzer with Information Sheet on 4/6/2020 (JGK).
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charles M. Bichler, John C. Gunderson, Lisa A. Hiniker, Michael D. Johnson, Ena M. Kovacevic, Lawgix Lawyers, LLC, Meier, Kennedy and Quinn, Chartered, Denise Suzanne Rahne, Robins Kaplan LLP, U.S. Bank (filing fee $400, receipt number 3-1015933) filed by Kenneth R. Kunzer. Filer requests summons issued. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Kate M. Menendez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Index, #2 Exhibit(s) A-P, #3 Exhibit(s) Q-DD, #4 Cover Letter, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Certificate of Service) (JGK) Document QC'd on 4/20/2020 (CLK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kunzer v. Hiniker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meier, Kennedy and Quinn, Chartered
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa A. Hiniker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robins Kaplan LLP
Represented By: Richard B Allyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esq. Charles M. Bichler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawgix Lawyers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esq. Michael D. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esq. Denise Suzanne Rahne
Represented By: Richard B Allyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esq. John C. Gunderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esq. Ena M. Kovacevic
Represented By: Richard B Allyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth R. Kunzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?