Benchmark Insurance Company, v. SUNZ Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Benchmark Insurance Company, and Benchmark Insurance Company
Defendant: United Wisconsin Life Insurance Co., Howard Leasing, Inc., Payday, Inc., Century Employer Organization LLC, Carolina's Construction Solutions LLC, Cornerstone Capital Group, Inc., Employco USA, Inc., Butler America Holdings Inc., the Accident Fund Group, Diverse Staffing, Inc., Waste Collection, Inc., Business Insurers of Georgia, Inc., CJ Kant Resource Group, LLC, Aviator Holdings LLC, Barton Staffing Solutions, Inc., Impact Staff Leasing, Inc., Quality Business Solutions, Inc., E3 HR, Inc., Total Staffing Solutions, LLC, Resourcing Edge I, LLC, ProStaff Solutions, LLC, Essential HR, Inc., HR Service Group LLC, Impact Outsourcing Solutions, Inc., IS Development Group, LLC, SUNZ Insurance Company, Cohesive Networks, Inc., Decision HR Holdings, Inc., Lightsource Holdings, LLC, SUNZ Insurance Solutions, LLC, Harbor America Holdings, Inc., Staff Pro, LLC, Team Company, Inc., Cortech, LLC, Innerstaff, PRO Resources, Corporation, United Wisconsin Insurance Company and Century Employer Organization, LLC
Case Number: 0:2020cv00908
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2020 Filing 173 RECEIPT number MNXCCA20-00069 in the amount of $20,533,594 issued to Benchmark Insurance Company. (JGK)
June 8, 2020 Filing 172 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #169 MOTION to Withdraw/Disburse/Release Funds from the Court Registry under Fed R. Civ. P 67(b) and L.R. 67.2 filed by SUNZ Insurance Company.(Lockner, Anne)
June 8, 2020 Filing 171 Withdrawal Payee Information re: #169 MOTION to Withdraw/Disburse/Release Funds from the Court Registry under Fed R. Civ. P 67(b) and L.R. 67.2. (Lockner, Anne)
June 8, 2020 Filing 170 Declaration of Anne M. Lockner in Support of #169 MOTION to Withdraw/Disburse/Release Funds from the Court Registry under Fed R. Civ. P 67(b) and L.R. 67.2 filed by SUNZ Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lockner, Anne)
June 8, 2020 Filing 169 MOTION to Withdraw/Disburse/Release Funds from the Court Registry under Fed R. Civ. P 67(b) and L.R. 67.2 filed by SUNZ Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lockner, Anne)
June 8, 2020 Filing 168 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Dismissal re Interpleader Funds #167 Notice (Other). (Zhao, X.)
June 8, 2020 Filing 167 NOTICE by Benchmark Insurance Company of Deposit of Interpleader Funds (Zhao, X.)
June 5, 2020 Filing 166 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benchmark Insurance Company. Howard Leasing, Inc. served on 6/1/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Zhao, X.)
June 4, 2020 Filing 165 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Innerstaff. (Williard, Steve)
June 4, 2020 Filing 164 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica C. Richardson on behalf of Butler America Holdings Inc., Payday, Inc.. (Richardson, Jessica)
June 4, 2020 Filing 163 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against SUNZ Insurance Company., COUNTERCLAIM against Benchmark Insurance Company. filed by Payday, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Exhibt A, #2 Redacted Exhibit B, #3 Notice of Noncompliance Exhibit C, #4 Redacted Exhibit D, #5 Finding of Good Cause Exhibit E) (Sonnesyn, Rolf) Modified text on 6/4/2020 (kt).
June 4, 2020 Filing 162 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against United Wisconsin Insurance Company., COUNTERCLAIM against Benchmark Insurance Company. filed by Butler America Holdings Inc.(Attachments: #1 Redacted Exhibt A, #2 Redacted Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C Notice of Noncompliance, #4 Redacted Exhibit D, #5 Redacted Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sonnesyn, Rolf) Modified text on 6/4/2020 (kt).
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER on #158 Stipulation. Defendant PRO Resources, Corporation's time to file its Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended until July 6, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 6/4/2020.(HAM)
June 4, 2020 Filing 160 NOTICE of Appearance by Rolf E Sonnesyn on behalf of Butler America Holdings Inc., Payday, Inc.. (Sonnesyn, Rolf)
June 4, 2020 Filing 159 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Stipulation for Extension of Time [for PRO Resources] to Answer Complaint #158 Stipulation. (Glover, Michael)
June 4, 2020 Filing 158 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by PRO Resources, Corporation. Jointly signed by Plaintiff. (Glover, Michael) Modified text on 6/4/2020 (kt).
June 4, 2020 Filing 157 INTERPLEADER by Carolina's Construction Solutions LLC. (McGrath, Daniel)
June 4, 2020 Filing 156 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel S McGrath on behalf of Carolina's Construction Solutions LLC. (McGrath, Daniel)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 7/7/2020 at 10:00 AM via Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 6/3/2020.(JRE)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting #44 Motion for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335). (Written Opinion). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 6/3/2020. (JRE)
June 3, 2020 Filing 153 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 7-Day Transcript of #143 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Renee Rogge. (Lockner, Anne)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #146 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Steve M Williard for Innerstaff. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 6/2/2020. (NAH)
June 1, 2020 Filing 151 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benchmark Insurance Company. CJ Kant Resource Group, LLC served on 5/22/2020, answer due 6/12/2020. (Zhao, X.)
June 1, 2020 Filing 150 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benchmark Insurance Company. Team Company, Inc. served on 5/22/2020, answer due 6/12/2020. (Zhao, X.)
June 1, 2020 Filing 149 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benchmark Insurance Company. Carolina's Construction Solutions LLC served on 5/27/2020, answer due 6/17/2020. (Zhao, X.)
June 1, 2020 Filing 148 DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST by CJ Kant Resource Group, LLC. (McGrath, Daniel) Modified text on 6/2/2020 (lmb).
June 1, 2020 Filing 147 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel S McGrath on behalf of CJ Kant Resource Group, LLC. (McGrath, Daniel)
June 1, 2020 Filing 146 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Steven M. Williard. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7765810 filed by Innerstaff. (Anderson, Clifford)
June 1, 2020 Filing 145 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Steve Williard as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (kt)
June 1, 2020 Filing 144 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR, DUPLICATE FILING - SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Zhao, X.) Modified text on 6/1/2020 (KNK).
June 1, 2020 Filing 143 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung: Motion Hearing held on 6/1/2020 re #44 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) filed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Court Reporter Renee Rogge). (JRE)
June 1, 2020 Filing 142 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR, DUPLICATE FILING - SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Zhao, X.) Modified text on 6/1/2020 (KNK).
June 1, 2020 Filing 141 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR, DUPLICATE FILING - SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benchmark Insurance Company served on 5/12/2020, answer due 6/2/2020. (Zhao, X.) Modified text on 6/1/2020 (KNK). Modified text on 6/1/2020 (KNK).
June 1, 2020 Filing 140 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benchmark Insurance Company. Aviator Holdings LLC served on 5/12/2020, answer due 6/2/2020. (Zhao, X.)
June 1, 2020 Filing 139 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Innerstaff. (Anderson, Clifford)
June 1, 2020 Filing 138 AMENDED NOTICE of Appearance by Clifford S Anderson on behalf of Innerstaff. (Anderson, Clifford) Modified text on 6/1/2020 (kt).
June 1, 2020 Filing 137 NOTICE of Appearance by Clifford S Anderson on behalf of Innerstaff. (Anderson, Clifford)
May 29, 2020 Filing 136 INTERPLEADER by Impact Staff Leasing, Inc.. (McGrath, Daniel)
May 29, 2020 Filing 135 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel S McGrath on behalf of Impact Staff Leasing, Inc.. (McGrath, Daniel)
May 28, 2020 Filing 134 INTERPLEADER by Staff Pro, LLC. (McGrath, Daniel)
May 28, 2020 Filing 133 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel S McGrath on behalf of Staff Pro, LLC. (McGrath, Daniel)
May 28, 2020 Filing 132 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-INCORRECT EVENT-DIRECTED TO REFILE. Return of Service Executed for Summons and Complaint, Motion for Leave to Deposit Interpleader Funds and Discharge and Notice of Hearing served on Team Company Inc. on 5/22/2020, filed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Zhao, X.) Modified text on 5/29/2020 (lmb).
May 28, 2020 Filing 131 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-INCORRECT EVENT-DIRECTED TO REFILE. Return of Service Executed for Summons and Complaint, Motion for Leave to Deposit Interpleader Funds and Discharge and Notice of Hearing served on CJ Kant Resource Group, LLC on 5/22/2020, filed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Zhao, X.) Modified text on 5/29/2020 (lmb).
May 28, 2020 Filing 130 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-INCORRECT EVENT-DIRECTED TO REFILE. Return of Service Executed for Summons and Complaint, Motion for Leave to Deposit Interpleader Funds and Discharge and Notice of Hearing served on Carolina's Construction Solutions LLC on 5/27/2020, filed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Zhao, X.) Modified text on 5/29/2020 (lmb).
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 129 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #128 Joint Motion Regarding Continued Sealing. Permanent Sealing GRANTED for Document Numbers: 35-1, 35-2, 39, and 42.Document Number to be UNSEALED: 35. Order on continued sealing becomes final on 6/25/2020 unless further timely submissions are filed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/28/2020. (JRE)
May 27, 2020 Filing 128 JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re #35 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #39 Reply, #40 Redacted Document filed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Zhao, X.)
May 27, 2020 Filing 127 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Defendant Resourcing Edge I, LLC's parent corporation is REI PEO Holding Company, LLC. (Anderson, Kadee) Modified text on 5/27/2020 (lmb).
May 27, 2020 Filing 126 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Resourcing Edge I, LLC. (Anderson, Kadee)
May 26, 2020 Filing 125 INTERPLEADER by Total Staffing Solutions, LLC. (McGrath, Daniel)
May 26, 2020 Filing 124 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel S McGrath on behalf of Total Staffing Solutions, LLC. (McGrath, Daniel)
May 22, 2020 Filing 123 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SUNZ Insurance Company re #88 Counterclaim, #18 Answer to Complaint (Lockner, Anne)
May 22, 2020 Filing 122 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #121 Sealed Document(s) - #121 Sealed Exhibit 6 and [121-1] Sealed Exhibit 7 to Second Declaration of X. Kevin Zhao filed by Benchmark Insurance Company.(Zhao, X.)
May 22, 2020 Filing 121 SEALED EXHIBIT 6 re #120 Declaration in Support filed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Sealed 7)(Zhao, X.)
May 22, 2020 Filing 120 Second Declaration of X. Kevin Zhao in Support of #44 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) filed by Benchmark Insurance Company.(Zhao, X.)
May 22, 2020 Filing 119 REPLY re #44 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) filed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Zhao, X.)
May 22, 2020 Filing 118 RECOGNITION OF BENCHMARKS DISCLAIMER AND DIRECTION OF PAYMENT TO SUNZ INSURANCE COMPANY filed by Lightsource Holdings, LLC. (McGrath, Daniel) Modified text on 5/22/2020 (kt).
May 22, 2020 Filing 117 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel S McGrath on behalf of Lightsource Holdings, LLC. (McGrath, Daniel)
May 21, 2020 Filing 116 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed for Summons and Complaint, Motion for Leave to Deposit Interpleader Funds and Discharge and Notice of Hearing served on Decision HR Holdings, Inc. on 05/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020 filed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Zhao, X.) Modified text on 5/22/2020 (kt).
May 21, 2020 Filing 115 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed for Summons and Complaint, Motion for Leave to Deposit Interpleader Funds and Discharge and Notice of Hearing served on Waste Collection, Inc. on 05/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020 filed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Zhao, X.) Modified text on 5/22/2020 (kt).
May 21, 2020 Filing 114 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed for Summons and Complaint, Motion for Leave to Deposit Interpleader Funds and Discharge and Notice of Hearing served on United Wisconsin Insurance Company on 05/18/2020, answer due 6/8/2020 filed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Zhao, X.) Modified text on 5/22/2020 (kt).
May 21, 2020 Filing 113 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed for Summons and Complaint, Motion for Leave to Deposit Interpleader Funds and Discharge and Notice of Hearing served on Staff Pro, LLC on 05/15/2020, answer due 6/5/2020 filed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Zhao, X.) Modified text on 5/22/2020 (kt).
May 21, 2020 Filing 112 RSUMMONS RETURNED Executed for Summons and Complaint, Motion for Leave to Deposit Interpleader Funds and Discharge and Notice of Hearing served on PRO Resources, Corporation on 05/15/2020, answer due 6/5/2020 filed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Zhao, X.) Modified text on 5/22/2020 (kt).
May 21, 2020 Filing 111 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed for Summons and Complaint, Motion for Leave to Deposit Interpleader Funds and Discharge and Notice of Hearing served on Payday, Inc. on 05/15/2020, answer due 6/5/2020 filed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Zhao, X.) Modified text on 5/22/2020 (kt).
May 21, 2020 Filing 110 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed for Summons and Complaint, Motion for Leave to Deposit Interpleader Funds and Discharge and Notice of Hearing served on Impact Staff leasing, Inc. on 05/15/2020, answer due 6/5/2020 filed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Zhao, X.) Modified text on 5/22/2020 (kt).
May 21, 2020 Filing 109 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed for Summons and Complaint, Motion for Leave to Deposit Interpleader Funds and Discharge and Notice of Hearing served on ProStaff Solutions, LLC on 05/14/2020, answer due 6/4/2020 filed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Zhao, X.) Modified text on 5/22/2020 (kt).
May 21, 2020 Filing 108 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed for Summons and Complaint, Motion for Leave to Deposit Interpleader Funds and Discharge and Notice of Hearing served on Innerstaff on 05/14/2020, answer due 6/4/2020 filed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Zhao, X.) Modified text on 5/22/2020 (kt).
May 21, 2020 Filing 107 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed for Summons and Complaint, Motion for Leave to Deposit Interpleader Funds and Discharge and Notice of Hearing served on Cohesive Networks, Inc. on 05/14/2020, answer due 6/4/2020 filed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Zhao, X.) Modified text on 5/22/2020 (kt).
May 21, 2020 Filing 106 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed for Summons and Complaint, Motion for Leave to Deposit Interpleader Funds and Discharge and Notice of Hearing served on Butler America Holdings, Inc. on 05/14/2020, answer due 6/4/2020 filed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Zhao, X.) Modified text on 5/22/2020 (kt).
May 21, 2020 Filing 105 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed for Summons and Complaint, Motion for Leave to Deposit Interpleader Funds and Discharge and Notice of Hearing served on Lighthouse Holdings, LLC on 05/13/2020, answer due 6/3/2020 filed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Zhao, X.) Modified text on 5/22/2020 (kt).
May 21, 2020 Filing 104 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed for Summons and Complaint, Motion for Leave to Deposit Interpleader Funds and Discharge and Notice of Hearing served on Impact Outsourcing Solutions, Inc. on 05/13/2020, answer due 6/3/2020 filed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Zhao, X.) Modified text on 5/22/2020 (kt).
May 21, 2020 Filing 103 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed for Summons and Complaint, Motion for Leave to Deposit Interpleader Funds and Discharge and Notice of Hearing served on Cortech, LLC on 05/13/2020, answer due 6/3/2020 filed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Zhao, X.) Modified text on 5/22/2020 (kt).
May 21, 2020 Filing 102 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed for Summons and Complaint, Motion for Leave to Deposit Interpleader Funds and Discharge and Notice of Hearing served on Resourcing Edge I, LLC on 05/12/2020, answer due 6/2/2020 filed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Zhao, X.) Modified text on 5/22/2020 (kt).
May 21, 2020 Filing 101 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed for Summons and Complaint, Motion for Leave to Deposit Interpleader Funds and Discharge and Notice of Hearing served on Quality Business Solutions, Inc. on 05/12/2020, answer due 6/2/2020 filed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Zhao, X.) Modified text on 5/22/2020 (kt).
May 21, 2020 Filing 100 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed for Summons and Complaint, Motion for Leave to Deposit Interpleader Funds and Discharge and Notice of Hearing served on IS Development Group, LLC on 05/12/2020, answer due 6/2/2020 filed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Zhao, X.) Modified text on 5/22/2020 (kt).
May 21, 2020 Filing 99 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed for Summons and Complaint, Motion for Leave to Deposit Interpleader Funds and Discharge and Notice of Hearing served on Harbor America Holdings, Inc. on 05/14/2020, answer due 6/4/2020 filed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Zhao, X.) Modified text on 5/22/2020 (kt).
May 21, 2020 Filing 98 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed for Summons and Complaint, Motion for Leave to Deposit Interpleader Funds and Discharge and Notice of Hearing served on Essential HR, Inc. on 05/12/2020, answer due 6/2/2020 filed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Zhao, X.) Modified text on 5/22/2020 (kt).
May 21, 2020 Filing 97 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed for Summons and Complaint, Motion for Leave to Deposit Interpleader Funds and Discharge and Notice of Hearing served on E3 HR, Inc. on 05/12/2020, answer due 6/2/2020 filed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Zhao, X.) Modified text on 5/22/2020 (kt).
May 21, 2020 Filing 96 SUMMONS RETURNED Executed for Summons and Complaint, Motion for Leave to Deposit Interpleader Funds and Discharge and Notice of Hearing served on Diverse Staffing on 05/12/2020, answer due 6/2/2020 filed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Zhao, X.) Modified text on 5/22/2020 (kt).
May 21, 2020 Filing 95 RECOGNITION OF BENCHMARKS DISCLAIMER AND DIRECTION OF PAYMENT TO SUNZ INSURANCE COMPANY filed by Quality Business Solutions, Inc.. (McGrath, Daniel) Modified text on 5/22/2020 (kt).
May 21, 2020 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel S McGrath on behalf of Quality Business Solutions, Inc.. (McGrath, Daniel)
May 21, 2020 Filing 93 Return of Service Executed for Summons and Complaint, Motion for Leave to Deposit Interpleader Funds and Discharge and Notice of Hearing served on Aviator Holdings LLC on 05/12/2020, filed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Zhao, X.)
May 21, 2020 Filing 92 RECOGNITION OF BENCHMARKS DISCLAIMER AND DIRECTION OF PAYMENT TO SUNZ INSURANCE COMPANY filed by IS Development Group, LLC. (McGrath, Daniel) Modified text on 5/22/2020 (kt).
May 21, 2020 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel S McGrath on behalf of IS Development Group, LLC. (McGrath, Daniel)
May 21, 2020 Filing 90 RECOGNITION OF BENCHMARKS DISCLAIMER AND DIRECTION OF PAYMENT TO SUNZ INSURANCE COMPANY filed by Harbor America Holdings, Inc.. (McGrath, Daniel) Modified text on 5/22/2020 (kt).
May 21, 2020 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel S McGrath on behalf of Harbor America Holdings, Inc.. (McGrath, Daniel)
May 20, 2020 Filing 88 COUNTERCLAIM against Benchmark Insurance Company. filed by SUNZ Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Lockner, Anne)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 (Text-Only) ORDER on #83 Stipulation. SUNZ Insurance Company shall file its proposed counterclaim within 14 days of the date of this Order. Benchmark Insurance Company's responsive pleading is due 21 days after the Counterclaim is filed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/20/2020.(JRE)
May 19, 2020 Filing 86 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #83 Stipulation. (Lockner, Anne)
May 19, 2020 Filing 85 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #84 Sealed Document(s) - #84 Sealed Exhibit 1 to Exhibit A ([Proposed] SUNZ Insurance Company's Counterclaim). (Lockner, Anne)
May 19, 2020 Filing 84 SEALED EXHIBIT 1 to Exhibit A ([Proposed] SUNZ Insurance Company's Counterclaim) re #83 Stipulation by SUNZ Insurance Company. (Lockner, Anne)
May 19, 2020 Filing 83 STIPULATION for Leave to File Counterclaim by SUNZ Insurance Company. Jointly Signed by Benchmark Insurance Company and SUNZ Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lockner, Anne)
May 19, 2020 Filing 82 RECOGNITION OF BENCHMARK'S DISCLAIMER AND DIRECTION OF PAYMENT TO SUNZ INSURANCE COMPANY by Howard Leasing, Inc. (McGrath, Daniel) Modified text on 5/19/2020 (lmb).
May 19, 2020 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel S McGrath on behalf of Howard Leasing, Inc.. (McGrath, Daniel)
May 19, 2020 Filing 80 RECOGNITION OF BENCHMARK'S DISCLAIMER AND DIRECTION OF PAYMENT TO SUNZ INSURANCE COMPANY by Team Company, Inc. (McGrath, Daniel) Modified text on 5/19/2020 (lmb).
May 19, 2020 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel S McGrath on behalf of Team Company, Inc.. (McGrath, Daniel)
May 18, 2020 Filing 78 DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST by United Wisconsin Insurance Company. (McGrath, Daniel) Modified text on 5/19/2020 (lmb).
May 18, 2020 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel S McGrath on behalf of United Wisconsin Insurance Company. (McGrath, Daniel)
May 18, 2020 Filing 76 DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST by HR Service Group LLC. (McGrath, Daniel) Modified text on 5/19/2020 (lmb).
May 18, 2020 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel S McGrath on behalf of HR Service Group LLC. (McGrath, Daniel)
May 18, 2020 Filing 74 (Text-Only) NOTICE: Remote Public Access to 73 Motion Hearing on 6/1/2020 at 1:00 PM. To obtain the login instructions, send an email to leung_chambers@mnd.uscourts.gov. (JRE)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 TEXT ONLY ORDER Setting Hearing on #44 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335). Motion Hearing set for 6/1/2020 at 01:00 PM via Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Login instructions to be provided to counsel by email. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/18/2020.(JRE)
May 18, 2020 Filing 72 DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST by E3 HR, Inc. (McGrath, Daniel) Modified text on 5/19/2020 (lmb).
May 18, 2020 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel S McGrath on behalf of E3 HR, Inc.. (McGrath, Daniel)
May 18, 2020 Filing 70 DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST by Cornerstone Capital Group, Inc. (McGrath, Daniel) Modified text on 5/19/2020 (lmb).
May 18, 2020 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel S McGrath on behalf of Cornerstone Capital Group, Inc.. (McGrath, Daniel)
May 18, 2020 Filing 68 DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST by Cohesive Networks, Inc. (McGrath, Daniel) Modified text on 5/18/2020 (lmb).
May 18, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel S McGrath on behalf of Cohesive Networks, Inc.. (McGrath, Daniel)
May 15, 2020 Filing 66 DECLARATION of Anne M. Lockner in Opposition to #44 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) filed by SUNZ Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lockner, Anne)
May 15, 2020 Filing 65 RESPONSE in Opposition re #44 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) filed by SUNZ Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lockner, Anne)
May 15, 2020 Filing 64 RECOGNITION OF BENCHMARK'S DISCLAIMER AND DIRECTION OF PAYMENT TO SUNZ INSURANCE COMPANY by Cortech, LLC. (McGrath, Daniel) Modified text on 5/18/2020 (lmb).
May 15, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel S McGrath on behalf of Cortech, LLC. (McGrath, Daniel)
May 15, 2020 Filing 62 RECOGNITION OF BENCHMARK'S DISCLAIMER AND DIRECTION OF PAYMENT TO SUNZ INSURANCE COMPANY by Business Insurers of Georgia, Inc. (McGrath, Daniel) Modified text on 5/18/2020 (lmb).
May 15, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel S McGrath on behalf of Business Insurers of Georgia, Inc.. (McGrath, Daniel)
May 15, 2020 Filing 60 RECOGNITION OF BENCHMARK'S DISCLAIMER AND DIRECTION OF PAYMENT TO SUNZ INSURANCE COMPANY by Barton Staffing Solutions, Inc. (McGrath, Daniel) Modified text on 5/18/2020 (lmb).
May 15, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel S McGrath on behalf of Barton Staffing Solutions, Inc.. (McGrath, Daniel)
May 15, 2020 Filing 58 INTERPLEADER by Essential HR, Inc.. (McGrath, Daniel)
May 15, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel S McGrath on behalf of Essential HR, Inc.. (McGrath, Daniel)
May 12, 2020 Filing 56 Summons Issued as to Cortech, LLC. (MMP)
May 12, 2020 Filing 55 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REISSUE - Summons Reissued as to Cortech, LLC. (MMP) Modified text on 5/12/2020 (MMP).
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying as moot #19 Motion to Compel and ORDER for party to file document/respond to Court. See Order for details.(Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/11/2020. (JRE)
May 11, 2020 Filing 53 (Text-Only) NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 5/11/2020 at 03:00 PM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung is hereby CANCELLED. (JRE)
May 8, 2020 Filing 52 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #44 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) filed by Benchmark Insurance Company.(Zhao, X.)
May 8, 2020 Filing 51 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #50 Sealed Document(s) - #50 Sealed Ex. 2, [50-1] Sealed Ex. 3, [50-2] Sealed Ex. 4 filed by Benchmark Insurance Company.(Zhao, X.)
May 8, 2020 Filing 50 SEALED EXHIBIT 2 re #49 Declaration in Support filed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) SEALED 3, #2 Exhibit(s) SEALED 4)(Zhao, X.)
May 8, 2020 Filing 49 Declaration of X. Kevin Zhao in Support of #44 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) filed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 5)(Zhao, X.)
May 8, 2020 Filing 48 Declaration of Andrew M. O'Brien in Support of #44 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) filed by Benchmark Insurance Company.(Zhao, X.)
May 8, 2020 Filing 47 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #44 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) filed by Benchmark Insurance Company.(Zhao, X.)
May 8, 2020 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM in Support re #44 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) filed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Zhao, X.)
May 8, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #44 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) : Date and time to be determined. (Zhao, X.)
May 8, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) filed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Registry Deposit Information Form)(Zhao, X.)
May 6, 2020 Filing 43 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #42 Sealed Document(s) - Sealed Ex. 1, #42 filed by Benchmark Insurance Company.(Zhao, X.)
May 6, 2020 Filing 42 SEALED EXHIBIT Sealed Ex. 1 re #41 Declaration in Opposition filed by Benchmark Insurance Company.(Zhao, X.)
May 6, 2020 Filing 41 DECLARATION of X. Kevin Zhao in Opposition to #19 MOTION to Compel Motion to Compel Deposit of Interpleader Funds filed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 2)(Zhao, X.)
May 6, 2020 Filing 40 Redacted Document for #39 BIC Sur-Reply in Response to Motion to Compel Deposit of Funds filed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Zhao, X.)
May 6, 2020 Filing 39 SEALED REPLY re #19 MOTION to Compel Motion to Compel Deposit of Interpleader Funds, #33 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Benchmark Insurance Company.(Zhao, X.)
May 5, 2020 Filing 38 (Text-Only) NOTICE: Remote Public Access to Motion Hearing on 5/11/2020 at 3:00 PM. To obtain the login instructions, send an email to leung_chambers@mnd.uscourts.gov. (JRE)
May 5, 2020 Filing 37 (Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. In recognition of the current efforts locally and nationally to protect persons from unnecessary potential exposure to COVID-19, the hearing set for May 11, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. shall take place by Zoom. Counsel will receive login information from the Court in advance of the hearing. No party, observer, and/or listener of the hearing shall record or permit the recording of the hearing, in whole or in part, in any fashion. (JRE)
May 4, 2020 Filing 36 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #35 Sealed Document(s) - #35 Sealed Herrig Exhibit A, [35-1] Sealed Herrig Exhibit B, [35-2] Sealed Herrig Exhibit C . (Lockner, Anne)
May 4, 2020 Filing 35 SEALED EXHIBITS Sealed Exhibits A-C re #34 Declaration by SUNZ Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Exhibit B, #2 Sealed Exhibit C)(Lockner, Anne) Modified text on 5/5/2020 (kt).
May 4, 2020 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Steven Herrig re #33 Reply to Response to Motion by SUNZ Insurance Company . (Lockner, Anne)
May 4, 2020 Filing 33 Reply to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Compel Motion to Compel Deposit of Interpleader Funds filed by SUNZ Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lockner, Anne)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 (Text-Only) ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT re #19 MOTION to Compel Motion to Compel Deposit of Interpleader Funds. Benchmark Insurance Company may file a surreply brief, not to exceed 1,700 words, on or before May 6, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/1/2020.(JRE)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to File Reply/Surreply. SUNZ Insurance Company's Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief is GRANTED. SUNZ Insurance Company may file a reply brief, not to exceed 1,700 words, on or before May 4, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/1/2020. (JRE)
May 1, 2020 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #26 MOTION for Leave to File Reply/Surreply in support of its Motion to Compel Deposit of Interpleader Funds [Dkt. 19] filed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Zhao, X.)
April 30, 2020 Filing 29 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #26 MOTION for Leave to File Reply/Surreply in support of its Motion to Compel Deposit of Interpleader Funds [Dkt. 19] filed by SUNZ Insurance Company.(Lockner, Anne)
April 30, 2020 Filing 28 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #26 Motion for Leave to File Reply/Surreply filed by SUNZ Insurance Company.(Lockner, Anne)
April 30, 2020 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Support re #26 MOTION for Leave to File Reply/Surreply in support of its Motion to Compel Deposit of Interpleader Funds [Dkt. 19] filed by SUNZ Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lockner, Anne)
April 30, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File Reply/Surreply in support of its Motion to Compel Deposit of Interpleader Funds [Dkt. 19] filed by SUNZ Insurance Company. (Lockner, Anne)
April 29, 2020 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM re #19 MOTION to Compel Motion to Compel Deposit of Interpleader Funds filed by Benchmark Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Zhao, X.)
April 22, 2020 Filing 24 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #19 Motion to Compel filed by SUNZ Insurance Company.(Lockner, Anne)
April 22, 2020 Filing 23 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #19 MOTION to Compel Motion to Compel Deposit of Interpleader Funds : Motion Hearing set for 5/11/2020 at 03:00 PM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (Lockner, Anne) Modified text on 4/23/2020 (kt).
April 20, 2020 Filing 22 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #19 MOTION to Compel Motion to Compel Deposit of Interpleader Funds filed by SUNZ Insurance Company.(Lockner, Anne)
April 20, 2020 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION to Compel Motion to Compel Deposit of Interpleader Funds filed by SUNZ Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lockner, Anne)
April 20, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #19 MOTION to Compel Motion to Compel Deposit of Interpleader Funds : Date and time to be determined. (Lockner, Anne)
April 20, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Compel Motion to Compel Deposit of Interpleader Funds filed by SUNZ Insurance Company. (Lockner, Anne)
April 17, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint filed by SUNZ Insurance Company. (Lockner, Anne)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. Case reassigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim and Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung for all further proceedings. Judge Patrick J. Schiltz, Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-908 JRT/TNL. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim and Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 4/16/2020. (MMG)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Christopher Stephen Carver for SUNZ Insurance Company and for SUNZ Insurance Solutions, LLC; granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jason Samuel Oletsky for SUNZ Insurance Company and for SUNZ Insurance Solutions, LLC. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 4/15/2020. (NAH)
April 15, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark L. Johnson on behalf of Benchmark Insurance Company. (Johnson, Mark)
April 14, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jason S. Oletsky. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7645788 filed by SUNZ Insurance Company, SUNZ Insurance Solutions, LLC. (Lockner, Anne)
April 14, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher S. Carver. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7644752 filed by SUNZ Insurance Company, SUNZ Insurance Solutions, LLC. (Lockner, Anne)
April 14, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SUNZ Insurance Company, SUNZ Insurance Solutions, LLC re #11 Notice (Other), #9 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #10 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, #8 Notice of Appearance (Lockner, Anne)
April 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by SUNZ Insurance Company, SUNZ Insurance Solutions, LLC of Related Cases (Lockner, Anne)
April 14, 2020 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. SUNZ Holdings, LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant SUNZ Insurance Solutions, LLC. (Lockner, Anne)
April 14, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. SUNZ Holdings, LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant SUNZ Insurance Company. (Lockner, Anne)
April 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne M Lockner on behalf of SUNZ Insurance Company, SUNZ Insurance Solutions, LLC. (Lockner, Anne)
April 10, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Staff Pro, LLC, Team Company, Inc., Total Staffing Solutions, LLC, Waste Collection, Inc. (MMP)
April 10, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to IS Development Group, LLC, Impact Outsourcing Solutions, Inc., Impact Staff Leasing, Inc., Innerstaff, Lightsource Holdings, LLC, PRO Resources, Corporation, Payday, Inc., ProStaff Solutions, LLC, Quality Business Solutions, Inc., Resourcing Edge I, LLC. (MMP)
April 10, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Cohesive Networks, Inc., Cornerstone Capital Group, Inc., Cortech, LLC, Decision HR Holdings, Inc., Diverse Staffing, Inc., E3 HR, Inc., Employco USA, Inc., Essential HR, Inc., HR Service Group LLC, Harbor America Holdings, Inc., Howard Leasing, Inc. (MMP)
April 10, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Aviator Holdings LLC, Barton Staffing Solutions, Inc., Business Insurers of Georgia, Inc., Butler America Holdings Inc., CJ Kant Resource Group, LLC, Carolina's Construction Solutions LLC, Century Employer Organization, LLC, SUNZ Insurance Company, SUNZ Insurance Solutions, LLC, United Wisconsin Insurance Company. (MMP)
April 9, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 20-cv-908 (PJS/DTS). (MMP)
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Benchmark Holding Company is a corporate parent of Plaintiff Benchmark Insurance Company,. (Zhao, X.)
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7634646) filed by Benchmark Insurance Company,. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Zhao, X.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benchmark Insurance Company, v. SUNZ Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Wisconsin Life Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Leasing, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel S McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payday, Inc.
Represented By: Rolf E Sonnesyn
Represented By: Jessica C. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century Employer Organization LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolina's Construction Solutions LLC
Represented By: Daniel S McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornerstone Capital Group, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel S McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employco USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butler America Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Rolf E Sonnesyn
Represented By: Jessica C. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: the Accident Fund Group
Represented By: Daniel S McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diverse Staffing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waste Collection, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Business Insurers of Georgia, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel S McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CJ Kant Resource Group, LLC
Represented By: Daniel S McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aviator Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barton Staffing Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel S McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impact Staff Leasing, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel S McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Business Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel S McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E3 HR, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel S McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Staffing Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Daniel S McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resourcing Edge I, LLC
Represented By: Kadee Jo Anderson
Represented By: James Schoeberl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ProStaff Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Essential HR, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel S McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HR Service Group LLC
Represented By: Daniel S McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impact Outsourcing Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IS Development Group, LLC
Represented By: Daniel S McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNZ Insurance Company
Represented By: Jason Samuel Oletsky
Represented By: Anne M Lockner
Represented By: Christopher Stephen Carver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cohesive Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel S McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Decision HR Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lightsource Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Daniel S McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNZ Insurance Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Jason Samuel Oletsky
Represented By: Anne M Lockner
Represented By: Christopher Stephen Carver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor America Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel S McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staff Pro, LLC
Represented By: Daniel S McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Team Company, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel S McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cortech, LLC
Represented By: Daniel S McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innerstaff
Represented By: Clifford S Anderson
Represented By: Steve M Williard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRO Resources, Corporation
Represented By: Michael Clark Glover
Represented By: Jason E Engkjer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Wisconsin Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel S McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century Employer Organization, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benchmark Insurance Company,
Represented By: X. Kevin Zhao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benchmark Insurance Company
Represented By: Lawrence M. Shapiro
Represented By: Anna Tobin
Represented By: Mark L. Johnson
Represented By: X. Kevin Zhao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?