Itasca Images, LLC v. Minnesota Multi-Housing Association
Plaintiff: Itasca Images, LLC
Defendant: Minnesota Multi-Housing Association
Case Number: 0:2020cv00943
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 8/31/2020. Confidential Letter to Court due by 9/2/2020. Status Conference set for 9/3/2020 at 08:30 AM by Conference Bridge before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Settlement Conference set for 9/9/2020 at 09:00 AM by Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/9/2020.(JMK)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/7/2020. Fact Discovery due by 10/23/2020. Expert Discovery due by 1/29/2021. Motions (non-disp) due 11/6/2020. Motions (disp) due by 2/26/2021. Ready for trial due by 6/28/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/9/2020. (JMK)
June 8, 2020 Filing 15 Minute Entry for Initial Pretrial Scheduling Conference held by Conference Bridge before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/8/2020. A written Pretrial Scheduling Order will be issued. (JMK)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/8/2020.(JMK)
June 2, 2020 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Itasca Images, LLC. Jointly Signed by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Stipulation For Protective Order)(Flaherty, Scott)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/1/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2020 at 09:00 AM by Conference Bridge before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 5/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JMK)
May 6, 2020 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Minnesota Multi-Housing Association. (Bazis, Jeanette)
May 6, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Minnesota Multi-Housing Association. (Bazis, Jeanette)
May 4, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Itasca Images, LLC. (Flaherty, Scott)
April 16, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Itasca Images, LLC re #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint (Flaherty, Scott)
April 16, 2020 Filing 7 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
April 15, 2020 Filing 6 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
April 15, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT ON FILING OF COPYRIGHT ACTION (The Clerk's Office will mail a copy of the AO 121 and the Complaint to the U.S Copyright Office.). (Flaherty, Scott)
April 15, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Minnesota Multi-Housing Association. (CLK)
April 15, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (3rd, 4th - Copyright, Trademark) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 20-cv-943 WMW/HB. (CLK)
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR/WRONG EVENT. DIRECTED TO REFILE. REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Flaherty, Scott) Modified text on 4/15/2020 (CLK).
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MHA (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7646677) filed by Itasca Images, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Flaherty, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Itasca Images, LLC v. Minnesota Multi-Housing Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Multi-Housing Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Itasca Images, LLC
Represented By: O. Joseph Balthazor, Jr
Represented By: Scott M Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?