Vance v. County of Ramsey, Minnesota et al
Plaintiff: Jenny Ann Vance
Defendant: Douglas Haider, Sara Naglosky, Lisa Daly, County of Ramsey, Minnesota and Andre Rongitsch
Case Number: 0:2020cv00949
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by County of Ramsey, Minnesota, Lisa Daly, Douglas Haider, Sara Naglosky, Andre Rongitsch.(Roche, Robert)
June 12, 2020 Filing 12 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #8 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by County of Ramsey, Minnesota, Lisa Daly, Douglas Haider, Sara Naglosky, Andre Rongitsch.(Roche, Robert)
June 12, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Robert B. Roche in SUPPORT OF #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by County of Ramsey, Minnesota, Lisa Daly, Douglas Haider, Sara Naglosky, Andre Rongitsch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-3)(Roche, Robert)
June 12, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by County of Ramsey, Minnesota, Lisa Daly, Douglas Haider, Sara Naglosky, Andre Rongitsch. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Affidavit of Service)(Roche, Robert)
June 12, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Date and time to be determined. (Roche, Robert)
June 12, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by County of Ramsey, Minnesota, Lisa Daly, Douglas Haider, Sara Naglosky, Andre Rongitsch. (Roche, Robert)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING ALL DISPOSITIVE AND NON-DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS to Magistrate Judge Leung Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 6/11/2020.(KMW)
May 18, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER to the Court filed by Jenny Ann Vance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Envelope)(MMG) Document QC'd on 6/12/2020 (JGK).
April 27, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Sara Naglosky, Lisa Daly, Andre Rongitsch, County of Ramsey, Minnesota, Douglas Haider. Sara Naglosky waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020; Lisa Daly waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020; Andre Rongitsch waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020; County of Ramsey, Minnesota waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020; Douglas Haider waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Parker, Kimberly)
April 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B Roche on behalf of County of Ramsey, Minnesota, Lisa Daly, Douglas Haider, Sara Naglosky, Andre Rongitsch. (Roche, Robert)
April 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly R Parker on behalf of County of Ramsey, Minnesota, Lisa Daly, Douglas Haider, Sara Naglosky, Andre Rongitsch. (Parker, Kimberly)
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to County of Ramsey, Minnesota, Lisa Daly, Douglas Haider, Sara Naglosky, Andre Rongitsch. (JGK) CC: Vance w/ Information Sheet (JGK).
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against County of Ramsey, Minnesota, Lisa Daly, Douglas Haider, Sara Naglosky, Andre Rongitsch (filing fee $400, receipt number 3-1015939) filed by Jenny Ann Vance. Filer requests summons issued. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JGK) Document QC'd on 4/30/2020 (JGK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vance v. County of Ramsey, Minnesota et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Haider
Represented By: Kimberly R Parker
Represented By: Robert B Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Naglosky
Represented By: Kimberly R Parker
Represented By: Robert B Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Daly
Represented By: Kimberly R Parker
Represented By: Robert B Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Ramsey, Minnesota
Represented By: Kimberly R Parker
Represented By: Robert B Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andre Rongitsch
Represented By: Kimberly R Parker
Represented By: Robert B Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenny Ann Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?