Tiffany v. Wisconsin Central Ltd.
Plaintiff: Matthew J. Tiffany
Defendant: Wisconsin Central Ltd.
Case Number: 0:2020cv00998
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER WHILE DISTRICT OF MINNESOTA IS UNDER GENERAL ORDER RELATED TO COVID-19: See Notice and Order for document submission deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 5/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JLB)
May 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W Fuller on behalf of Matthew J. Tiffany. (Fuller, Thomas)
May 22, 2020 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Defendant Wisconsin Central Ltd. is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Grand Trunk Corporation. (Holman, Eric) Modified text on 5/26/2020 (lmb).
May 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric E Holman on behalf of Wisconsin Central Ltd.. (Holman, Eric)
May 22, 2020 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint filed by Wisconsin Central Ltd.. (Holman, Eric)
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Wisconsin Central Ltd., a Delaware Corporation (MMP)
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 5th Division Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 20-cv-998 (ECT/LIB). (MMP)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Cortney S LeNeave on behalf of Matthew J Tiffany. (LeNeave, Cortney)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wisconsin Central Ltd., a Delaware corporation, d/b/a Canadian National Railway Company, a foreign corporation (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7669714) filed by Matthew J Tiffany. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (LeNeave, Cortney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tiffany v. Wisconsin Central Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew J. Tiffany
Represented By: Thomas W Fuller
Represented By: Cortney S LeNeave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Central Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?