Cardiovascular Systems, Inc. v. Petrucci et al
Plaintiff: Cardiovascular Systems, Inc and Cardiovascular Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Gary M. Petrucci, Lela Nadirashvili and Gary Petrucci
Case Number: 0:2020cv01043
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2020 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Daniel L. Allender in Opposition to #15 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Cardiovascular Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Allender, Daniel)
June 26, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Cardiovascular Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Allender, Daniel)
June 5, 2020 Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #15 Motion to Dismiss/General. (Hall, Daniel)
June 5, 2020 Filing 18 Declaration of Daniel R. Hall in Support of #15 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Gary Petrucci. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-4)(Hall, Daniel)
June 5, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Gary Petrucci. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hall, Daniel)
June 5, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #15 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 8/18/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Hall, Daniel)
June 5, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Gary Petrucci. (Hall, Daniel)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (Text-Only) ORDER on #12 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Gary Petrucci answer due 6/5/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 6/1/2020.(KAT)
June 1, 2020 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #12 Stipulation. (Hall, Daniel)
June 1, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extension of Time to Respond by Gary Petrucci. Jointly Signed by Cardiovascular Systems, Inc.. (Hall, Daniel)
May 28, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Cardiovascular Systems, Inc. (Allender, Daniel)
May 13, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cardiovascular Systems, Inc.. Gary Petrucci served on 5/12/2020, answer due 6/2/2020. (Silberfeld, Roman)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Roman M. Silberfeld for Cardiovascular Systems, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 5/6/2020. (NAH)
May 5, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Roman M. Silberfeld. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7697851 filed by Cardiovascular Systems, Inc.. (Silberfeld, Roman) Modified text on 5/6/2020 (NAH).
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #2 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel Lewis Allender for Cardiovascular Systems, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 5/1/2020. (NAH)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. This case reassigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson for all further proceedings. Judge Patrick J. Schiltz no longer assigned to case. NOTE: The new case number is 20-cv-1043 SRN/KMM. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz and Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 4/30/2020.(CLK)
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Roman M. Silberfeld as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (CLK)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Lela Nadirashvili, Gary Petrucci. (CLK)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-1043 PJS/KMM. (CLK)
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel L. Allender. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7684751 filed by Cardiovascular Systems, Inc. (Allender, Daniel)
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7684739) filed by Cardiovascular Systems, Inc. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Allender, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cardiovascular Systems, Inc. v. Petrucci et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary M. Petrucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lela Nadirashvili
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Petrucci
Represented By: Joseph W Anthony
Represented By: Daniel R Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cardiovascular Systems, Inc
Represented By: Daniel Lewis Allender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cardiovascular Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas F Berndt
Represented By: Daniel Lewis Allender
Represented By: Roman M. Silberfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?