Poultry Borderless Company, LLC v. Froemming et al
Plaintiff: Poultry Borderless Company, LLC
Defendant: TFC Partners, LLC, Darrin Froemming and Trent Froemming
Case Number: 0:2020cv01054
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Daniel J. Supalla in Opposition to #13 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Poultry Borderless Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A and B)(Elsass, Douglas)
June 24, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Poultry Borderless Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Elsass, Douglas)
June 19, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Poultry Borderless Company, LLC. (Elsass, Douglas)
June 3, 2020 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #13 Motion to Dismiss/General. (Frohman, Charles)
June 3, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #13 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 8/14/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Frohman, Charles)
June 3, 2020 Filing 16 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #13 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Darrin Froemming, Trent Froemming, TFC Partners, LLC.(Frohman, Charles)
June 3, 2020 Filing 15 Declaration of Charles G. Frohman in Support of #13 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Darrin Froemming, Trent Froemming, TFC Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - 6, #2 Exhibit(s) 7 - 11)(Frohman, Charles)
June 3, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Darrin Froemming, Trent Froemming, TFC Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Frohman, Charles)
June 3, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Darrin Froemming, Trent Froemming, TFC Partners, LLC. (Frohman, Charles)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER on #10 Stipulation. Darrin Froemming answer due 6/3/2020; Trent Froemming answer due 6/3/2020; TFC Partners, LLC answer due 6/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 6/2/2020.(JRG)
June 1, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 Stipulation. (Frohman, Charles)
June 1, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, (Second) for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Darrin Froemming, Trent Froemming, TFC Partners, LLC. Jointly Signed by Poultry Borderless Company, LLC. (Frohman, Charles)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on #6 Stipulation. Darrin Froemming answer due 6/1/2020; Trent Froemming answer due 6/1/2020; TFC Partners, LLC answer due 6/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 5/12/2020.(JLB)
May 11, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Darrin Froemming, Trent Froemming, TFC Partners, LLC. (Bindman, Jevon)
May 11, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 Stipulation,. (Frohman, Charles)
May 11, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Darrin Froemming, Trent Froemming, TFC Partners, LLC. Jointly Signed by Poultry Borderless Company, LLC, Darrin Froemming, Trent Froemming, and TFC Partners, LLC. (Frohman, Charles)
May 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Darrin Froemming, Trent Froemming, TFC Partners, LLC. (Frohman, Charles)
May 4, 2020 Filing 4 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
May 1, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Darrin Froemming, Trent Froemming, TFC Partners, LLC. (KNK)
May 1, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 6th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 20-cv-1054 (WMW/LIB). (KNK)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Darrin Froemming, Trent Froemming, TFC Partners, LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7687497) filed by Poultry Borderless Company, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Elsass, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poultry Borderless Company, LLC v. Froemming et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Poultry Borderless Company, LLC
Represented By: Douglas L Elsass
Represented By: Daniel J. Supalla
Represented By: Leah N. Kippola-Friske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TFC Partners, LLC
Represented By: Charles G Frohman
Represented By: Jevon Bindman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrin Froemming
Represented By: Charles G Frohman
Represented By: Jevon Bindman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trent Froemming
Represented By: Charles G Frohman
Represented By: Jevon Bindman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?