Plains Commerce Bank v. Garbers
Plaintiff: Plains Commerce Bank
Defendant: Sixta Farms LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Linda Garbers
Counter Defendant: Richland Farms Partnership, Lisa Sixta and Randy Sixta
Case Number: 0:2020cv01093
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Donovan W Frank
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plains Commerce Bank re #20 Meet and Confer Statement, #15 Meet and Confer Statement, #17 MOTION to Dismiss/General Counterclaims, #21 Proposed Order to Judge, #12 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , #19 Memorandum, #18 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #13 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #14 Memorandum, #16 Proposed Order to Judge (Brakke, Jon)
June 24, 2020 Filing 21 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #17 MOTION to Dismiss/General Counterclaims filed by Plains Commerce Bank.(Brakke, Jon)
June 24, 2020 Filing 20 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #17 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Plains Commerce Bank.(Brakke, Jon)
June 24, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM re #17 MOTION to Dismiss/General Counterclaims filed by Plains Commerce Bank.(Brakke, Jon)
June 24, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #17 MOTION to Dismiss/General Counterclaims : Motion Hearing set for 9/4/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7C (STP) before Judge Donovan W. Frank. (Brakke, Jon)
June 24, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss/General Counterclaims filed by Plains Commerce Bank. (Brakke, Jon)
June 24, 2020 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #12 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Plains Commerce Bank.(Brakke, Jon)
June 24, 2020 Filing 15 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #12 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Plains Commerce Bank.(Brakke, Jon)
June 24, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM re #12 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Plains Commerce Bank.(Brakke, Jon)
June 24, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #12 MOTION for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings: Motion Hearing set for 9/4/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7C (STP) before Judge Donovan W. Frank. (Brakke, Jon) Modified text on 6/25/2020 (lmb).
June 24, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Plains Commerce Bank. (Brakke, Jon) Modified text on 6/25/2020 (lmb).
June 23, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linda Garbers. Richland Farms Partnership served on 6/12/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Lisa Sixta served on 6/12/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Randy Sixta served on 6/12/2020, answer due 7/6/2020; Sixta Farms LLC served on 6/12/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Grace, Jeff)
June 5, 2020 Filing 10 Third Party Summons Issued as to Richland Farms Partnership, Lisa Sixta, Randy Sixta, Sixta Farms LLC. (CLK) Modified text on 6/5/2020 (CLK).
June 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Sherlock on behalf of Linda Garbers. (Sherlock, Jacob)
June 3, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Sixta Farms LLC, Randy Sixta, Richland Farms Partnership, Lisa Sixta., COUNTERCLAIM against Sixta Farms LLC, Randy Sixta, Richland Farms Partnership, Lisa Sixta. filed by Linda Garbers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-F, #2 Exhibit(s) Redacted Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit(s) Redacted Exhibit H, #4 Exhibit(s) Redacted Exhibit I, #5 Exhibit(s) Redacted Exhibit J, #6 Exhibit(s) Redacted Exhibit K, #7 Exhibit(s) Redacted Exhibit L, #8 Exhibit(s) Redacted Exhibit M, #9 Exhibit(s) Redacted Exhibit N, #10 Exhibit(s) Redacted Exhibit O, #11 Exhibit(s) Redacted Exhibit P, #12 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sherlock, Jacob)
May 15, 2020 Filing 7 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. DUPLICATE OF DOC. 6. SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plains Commerce Bank. (Brakke, Jon) Modified text on 5/18/2020 (JME).
May 15, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plains Commerce Bank. Linda Garbers served on 5/13/2020, answer due 6/3/2020. (Brakke, Jon) Modified text on 5/18/2020 (JME).
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Donovan W. Frank's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these practice pointers, in addition to the District of Minnesota's Local Rules and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (las)
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
May 7, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for 2 Notice of Initial Case Assignment. Text has been updated to reflect correct judge assignment. Case was assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank, but the text entry incorrectly listed Judge David S. Doty. (CLK)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Linda Garbers. (CLK)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 20-cv-1093 DWF/HB. (CLK) Modified text on 5/7/2020 (CLK).
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7701344) filed by Plains Commerce Bank. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - 10/29/2013 promissory note, #2 Exhibit(s) 2/19/14 promissory note, #3 Exhibit(s) 4/16/14 promissory note, #4 Exhibit(s) 3/31/15 promissory note, #5 Exhibit(s) 6/29/15 promissory note, #6 Exhibit(s) 9/9/16 promissory note, #7 Exhibit(s) 9/9/16 promissory note, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (Brakke, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plains Commerce Bank v. Garbers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Linda Garbers
Represented By: Jeff Grace
Represented By: Christopher M Roe
Represented By: Jacob Sherlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plains Commerce Bank
Represented By: Jon R Brakke
Represented By: Drew J Hushka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sixta Farms LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Richland Farms Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Lisa Sixta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Randy Sixta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?