McCourt v. Carnahan et al
Plaintiff: Noah J McCourt
Defendant: Minnesota Republican Party of Minnesota and Jennifer Carnahan
Case Number: 0:2020cv01116
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Becky R Thorson
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Noah J. McCourt re: #4 Order granting IFP. (CLK)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 6/9/2020. (LPH)
May 21, 2020 Filing 3 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #1 #2 . Address label says: Return to Sender, No Such Number, Unable to Forward. The address was: 33 W Lake St. #404Waconia, MN 55387. Mail not re-sent to Noah J McCourt as we have no other address. (MMG). Document QC'd on 7/2/2020 (MTP).
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Noah J McCourt. (JGK) Document QC'd on 5/14/2020 (JGK).
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jennifer Carnahan, Minnesota Republican Party of Minnesota filed by Noah J McCourt. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Civil Rights Housing/Accomindations & ADA Other list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JGK) Document QC'd on 5/14/2020 (JGK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCourt v. Carnahan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah J McCourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Republican Party of Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Carnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?