Parker v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Marne Parker
Defendant: Arizant Healthcare, Inc. and 3M Company
Case Number: 0:2020cv01280
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Joan N Ericksen
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin W Hulse on behalf of 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc.. (Hulse, Benjamin)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER STAYING CASE pending resolution of the appeal. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 6/4/2020.(CBC)
May 31, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marne Parker. 3M Company served on 5/31/2020, answer due 6/22/2020; Arizant Healthcare, Inc. served on 5/31/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Zimmerman, Genevieve)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MDL PRETRIAL ORDER No. 1 Establishing Procedures Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 1/13/2016.(MKB)
May 29, 2020 Filing 4 (Text-Only) COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: This docket contains pleadings and orders pertaining to this case only and some, but not all, orders from the master case file In re: Bair Hugger Forced Air Warming Devices Products Liability Litigation, 0:15-md-2666 (JNE/DTS). Counsel shall read and comply with all Pretrial Orders filed in this master case. Pleadings filed and orders issued in the master case may be accessed through the master docket sheet at 0:15-md-2666-JNE-DTS. Additionally, access to Pretrial Orders, minutes, transcripts, and other documents issued in the master case may be found on the Bair Hugger MDL website at: www.mnd.uscourts.gov/MDL-Bair-Hugger/index.shtml. (MKB)
May 29, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc. (MKB)
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per Civil (MDL Direct Assign) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 20-cv-1280 (JNE/DTS). (MKB)
May 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7760867) filed by Marne Parker. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Zimmerman, Genevieve)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizant Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Benjamin W Hulse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marne Parker
Represented By: Genevieve M Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?