Holmes v. City of St. Paul, MN et al
Plaintiff: Ambakisye Holmes
Defendant: City of St. Paul, MN and State of Minnesota, The
Case Number: 0:2020cv01313
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 OBJECTION TO #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION filed by Ambakisye Holmes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(kt)
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ambakisye Holmes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmb)
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint, filed by Ambakisye Holmes, #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Ambakisye Holmes filed by Ambakisye Holmes. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 6/17/2020.(TJB)
June 17, 2020 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Docs #1 - #3 not re-sent to Ambakisye Holmes. Address unknown.(CLK) Document QC'd on 7/16/2020 (JGK).
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO DEFEND filed by Ambakisye Holmes (JGK) Modified text on 6/8/2020 (MMP).
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Ambakisye Holmes. (JGK)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of St. Paul, MN, State of Minnesota, The filed by Ambakisye Holmes. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (JGK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holmes v. City of St. Paul, MN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of St. Paul, MN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Minnesota, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ambakisye Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?