3M Company v. Starsiak et al
Plaintiff: 3M Company
Defendant: John Does 1 - 10, Matthew Starsiak and AMK Energy Services LLC
Case Number: 0:2020cv01314
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph M Price on behalf of 3M Company. (Price, Joseph)
July 27, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Kiera Murphy on behalf of 3M Company. (Murphy, Kiera)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER on #41 Stipulation to Extend TRO to September 9, 2020 Hearing Date. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 7/6/2020. (SMD)
July 2, 2020 Filing 43 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by 3M Company Regarding Parties' Meet and Confer. (Sawers, Michael)
July 2, 2020 Filing 42 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #41 Stipulation. (Vaccaro, Robert)
July 2, 2020 Filing 41 STIPULATION to Extend TRO to September 9, 2020 Hearing Date by AMK Energy Services LLC, Matthew Starsiak. Jointly Signed by 3M Company. (Vaccaro, Robert)
July 1, 2020 Filing 40 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing (Motion for Temporary Restraining Order) held on 6/25/2020 before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (29 pages). Court Reporter: Carla Bebault. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.Transcript temporarily sealed to determine if redactions are required. Parties have 7 days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction or Notice that No Redaction is Required. In accordance with Judicial Conference policy and #Local Rule 80.1, the transcript may be released and made remotely electronically available to the public in 90 days. For further information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5 and #Case Information >Transcripts, Court Reporters and Digital Audio Recordings. Notice Intent/No Intent to Request Redactions due 7/8/2020. Redaction Request due 7/22/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/3/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2020. (CRB)
June 29, 2020 Filing 39 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 3-Day Transcript of #38 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (Ursu, John)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #8 Motion for TRO; deferring #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 6/26/2020. (MJC)
June 25, 2020 Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: Motion Hearing held on 6/25/2020 re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by 3M Company. (Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (SMD)
June 25, 2020 Filing 36 Supplemental Declaration of Haley Schaffer in Support of #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2)(Ursu, John)
June 25, 2020 Filing 35 REPLY re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Ursu, John)
June 25, 2020 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Robert W. Vaccaro in Opposition to #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by AMK Energy Services LLC, Matthew Starsiak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Vaccaro, Robert)
June 25, 2020 Filing 33 RESPONSE re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by AMK Energy Services LLC, Matthew Starsiak. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Vaccaro, Robert)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #24 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Peter W. Baldwin for 3M Company. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 6/24/2020. (JGK)
June 24, 2020 Filing 31 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Motion to Dismiss #27 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. (Vaccaro, Robert)
June 24, 2020 Filing 30 Declaration of Matthew I. Starsiak in Support of #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by AMK Energy Services LLC, Matthew Starsiak. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-E)(Vaccaro, Robert)
June 24, 2020 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Support re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by AMK Energy Services LLC, Matthew Starsiak. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Vaccaro, Robert)
June 24, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Vaccaro, Robert)
June 24, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by AMK Energy Services LLC, Matthew Starsiak. (Vaccaro, Robert)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-1314 (SRN/DTS). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/23/2020.(lmb)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-1314 SRN/HB. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 6/23/2020.(CLK)
June 23, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Peter W. Baldwin. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7824256 filed by 3M Company. (Sawers, Michael)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-1314 SRN/BRT. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 6/23/2020.(CLK)
June 23, 2020 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Isaac B. Hall re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested by 3M Company Regarding Notice to Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4)(Hall, Isaac)
June 23, 2020 Filing 21 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff 3M Company. (Ursu, John)
June 22, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested : Motion Hearing set for 6/25/2020 at 03:30 PM in Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (Ursu, John)
June 22, 2020 Filing 19 (Text-Only) NOTICE: Remote Public Access to the telephonic hearing on #8 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order on 6/25/2020 at 3:30 PM is available.To join the telephonic hearing, dial 1-888-684-8852 and use access code 3044663 and security code 201314. (SMD)
June 22, 2020 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Motion for Preliminary Injunction #8 Motion for TRO, Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Ursu, John)
June 22, 2020 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #8 Motion for TRO, Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Ursu, John)
June 22, 2020 Filing 16 Declaration of Matthew Hise in Support of #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2)(Ursu, John)
June 22, 2020 Filing 15 Declaration of John Ursu in Support of #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Exhibit(s) 8, #9 Exhibit(s) 9, #10 Exhibit(s) 10, #11 Exhibit(s) 11, #12 Exhibit(s) 12, #13 Exhibit(s) 13, #14 Exhibit(s) 14)(Ursu, John)
June 22, 2020 Filing 14 Declaration of Ivan Fong in Support of #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2)(Ursu, John)
June 22, 2020 Filing 13 Declaration of Haley Schaffer in Support of #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2)(Ursu, John)
June 22, 2020 Filing 12 Declaration of Charles Stobbie in Support of #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6)(Ursu, John)
June 22, 2020 Filing 11 Declaration of David A. Crist in Support of #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Exhibit(s) 8, #9 Exhibit(s) 9)(Ursu, John)
June 22, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Ursu, John)
June 22, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested : Date and time to be determined. (Ursu, John)
June 22, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by 3M Company. (Ursu, John)
June 9, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 3M Company. AMK Energy Services LLC served on 6/8/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. (Ursu, John)
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 3M Company. Matthew Starsiak served on 6/8/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. (Ursu, John)
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Ursu, John)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to AMK Energy Services LLC, John Does 1 - 10, Matthew Starsiak. (KNK)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Peter W. Baldwin as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (KNK)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd, 4th -Copyright, Trademark list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 20-cv-1314 (SRN/TNL). (KNK)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMK Energy Sevices, LLC, John Does 1 - 10, Matthew Starsiak (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7777957) filed by 3M Company. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Exhibit(s) 8, #9 Exhibit(s) 9, #10 Exhibit(s) 10, #11 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ursu, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 3M Company v. Starsiak et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 3M Company
Represented By: Kerry L Bundy
Represented By: John W. Ursu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 - 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Starsiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMK Energy Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?