Nelson v. Aldi Inc. (Minnesota) et al
Case Number: 0:2020cv01321
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF LAWSUIT AND REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service for Defendant Aldi Inc.. Documents have been mailed to all listed defendants: Order Granting IFP, Complaint, two Waiver of Services (AO 399), and one Prepaid Envelope. Waiver of Service due by 9/2/2020. (MMP)
August 3, 2020 Filing 23 Third Party Summons Issued as to JBM Patrol & Protection Corp.. (MMG) Modified text on 8/3/2020 (MMG).
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER in Response to #21 Letter to Magistrate Judge. See Order for details. (Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 7/31/2020.(BJP)
July 30, 2020 Filing 21 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Aldi Inc. (Minnesota) . (Peschel, Mark)
July 29, 2020 Filing 20 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Request to Clerk's Office to Issue Summons for Third-Party Complaint of Aldi Inc. (Minnesota). (Peschel, Mark)
July 24, 2020 Filing 19 Clerk's Notice of APPLICATION FOR PRO SE LITIGANT TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY. Warren F. Nelson is GRANTED e-filing privileges in this case. Pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 5 and 7(d), Warren F. Nelson has consented to electronic service and has agreed to waive service by other means for all subsequent filings in this case, except when electronic service is not allowed under the rules. (JGK)
July 23, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF LAWSUIT AND REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service for Defendant Aldi Inc. (Minnesota) d/b/a Aldi Store # 67 et al. Documents have been mailed to all listed defendants: Order Granting IFP, Complaint, two Waiver of Services (AO 399), and one Prepaid Envelope. Waiver of Service due by 8/24/2020. (KDS)
July 13, 2020 Filing 17 LETTER REFERRING Litigant to FBA Pro Se Project from Magistrate Judge Katherine Menendez.(KAT)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (Text-Only) ORDER STAYING CASE and in Response to #13 Letter to Magistrate Judge. The Court will refer the plaintiff to the FBA's Pro Se Project by a separate letter. Pending that referral this case is stayed for a period of 45 days. On 8/27/2020, the Court will review the stay to determine whether it should be continued or whether other appropriate steps should be considered. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 7/29/2020 at 11:30 AM is CANCELED until further notice of the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 7/13/2020.(BJP)
July 10, 2020 Filing 15 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against JBM Patrol & Protection Corp.. filed by Aldi Inc. (Minnesota). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B) (Peschel, Mark) Modified text on 7/13/2020 (MMG).
July 9, 2020 Filing 14 (Text-Only) NOTICE of Resetting of Hearing: Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 7/29/2020 at 10:00 AM has been RESCHEDULED. The Telephonic Pretrial Conference will commence on 7/29/2020 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Counsel should use the call-in instructions previously provided. **THIS IS A TIME CHANGE ONLY**(KAT)
July 8, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE, CONSENT, AND REFERENCE OF A CIVIL ACTION TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE filed by Warren F. Nelson (only) (MMP) Modified text on 8/3/2020 (MMP).
July 8, 2020 Filing 13 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE filed by Warren F. Nelson. re: request for referral to "FBA" Pro Se Project (MMP) Modified text on 7/8/2020 (MMP). Document QC'd on 7/10/2020 (MMG).
July 8, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION TO DENY DEFENDANTS DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Warren F. Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(MMP) Document QC'd on 7/10/2020 (MMG).
July 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by Warren F. Nelson (MMP) Document QC'd on 7/10/2020 (MMG).
July 2, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Warren F. Nelson enclosing: #8 Order Granting IFP and USM Form to Complete. cc: Warren F. Nelson. (lmb)
July 1, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Aldi Inc. (Minnesota) re #4 Answer to Complaint (Peschel, Mark)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 7/1/2020. (KAT)
June 30, 2020 Filing 7 SEALED Letter from the Court to Mr. Nelson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 6/30/2020.(KAT). cc: Warren F. Nelson. Modified text on 7/1/2020 (MTP).
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER/NOTICE: Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 7/29/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Call-in instructions will be provided to the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 6/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(KAT)
June 26, 2020 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Defendant Aldi Inc. (Minnesota) discloses that its parent corporation is Aldi Inc., there are no publicly-traded companies associated with Aldi Inc., and there is no publicly-traded corporation that owns 10% or more of its stock.. (Peschel, Mark) Modified text on 6/29/2020 (MMG).
June 26, 2020 Filing 4 Aldi Inc. (Minnesota)'s ANSWER to Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Aldi Inc. (Minnesota). (Peschel, Mark)
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark J Peschel on behalf of Aldi Inc. (Minnesota). (Peschel, Mark)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Warren F. Nelson. (NAH) Document QC'd on 7/17/2020 (MMG).
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aldi Inc. (Minnesota), CT Corporation System filed by Warren F. Nelson. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Envelope) (NAH) Document QC'd on 7/17/2020 (MMG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Aldi Inc. (Minnesota) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?