Clark v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Plaintiff: Carrie Clark
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Case Number: 0:2020cv01339
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Filing 18 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #13 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Boston Scientific Corporation.(Baker, Scholastica)
August 3, 2020 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #13 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Boston Scientific Corporation.(Baker, Scholastica)
August 3, 2020 Filing 16 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #13 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Boston Scientific Corporation.(Baker, Scholastica)
August 3, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Baker, Scholastica)
August 3, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #13 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Baker, Scholastica)
August 3, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Baker, Scholastica)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER on #10 Stipulation. Boston Scientific Corporation answer due 8/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 6/22/2020.(JLB)
June 22, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 Stipulation. (Baker, Scholastica)
June 22, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Extend the Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Boston Scientific Corporation. Jointly Signed by Carrie Clark. (Baker, Scholastica)
June 22, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Scholastica N.S. Baker on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Baker, Scholastica)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Georgiana Boss for Carrie Clark; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel Christopher Burke for Carrie Clark. Approved by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 6/17/2020. (NAH)
June 16, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel C. Burke. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7803901 filed by Carrie Clark. (Flaherty, Yvonne)
June 16, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Georgiana Boss. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7803880 filed by Carrie Clark. (Flaherty, Yvonne)
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Daniel C. Burke, Georgiana Boss as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (MKB)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Boston Scientific Corporation. (MKB)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (5th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 20-cv-1339 (WMW/LIB). (MKB)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Boston Scientific Corporation (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7789495) filed by Carrie Clark. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Flaherty, Yvonne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: Scholastica N.S. Baker
Represented By: John W. Ursu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Clark
Represented By: Yvonne M Flaherty
Represented By: Daniel Christopher Burke, I
Represented By: Georgiana Boss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?