James L Ratcliff v. Rancher's Legacy Meat Co., et al
Appellee: Rancher's Legacy Meat Co.,, The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors and Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, The
Appellant: James L Ratcliff
Case Number: 0:2020cv01343
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting in part and denying in part (39) Motion for Extension of Time in case 0:20-cv-00834-NEB; granting in part and denying in part (38) Motion for Extension of Time in case 0:20-cv-00835-NEB; granting in part and denying in part (37) Motion for Extension of Time in case 0:20-cv-01343-NEB Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 7/29/2020. Associated Cases: 0:20-cv-00834-NEB, 0:20-cv-00835-NEB, 0:20-cv-01343-NEB(KMW)
July 29, 2020 Filing 46 DECLARATION of Kenneth C. Edstrom re #45 Appellant's Reply Brief by James L Ratcliff in Support of Supplementation of Record. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) J)(Edstrom, Kenneth)
July 29, 2020 Filing 45 Appellant's REPLY BRIEF by James L Ratcliff. (Edstrom, Kenneth)
July 28, 2020 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #37 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supersedeas Bond filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, The, Rancher's Legacy Meat Co.,. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lallier, Cameron)
July 24, 2020 Filing 43 Declaration of James L. Ratcliff in Support of #37 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supersedeas Bond filed by James L Ratcliff.(Edstrom, Kenneth)
July 24, 2020 Filing 42 (Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS. A Response to Plaintiff's Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supersedeas Bond is due by 7/28/20. A ruling will be made on the papers. (KMW)
July 23, 2020 Filing 41 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #37 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supersedeas Bond filed by James L Ratcliff.(Edstrom, Kenneth)
July 23, 2020 Filing 40 Declaration of James L. Ratcliff in Support of #37 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supersedeas Bond filed by James L Ratcliff.(Edstrom, Kenneth)
July 23, 2020 Filing 39 Declaration of Kenneth C. Edstrom in Support of #37 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supersedeas Bond filed by James L Ratcliff.(Edstrom, Kenneth)
July 23, 2020 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM in Support re #37 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supersedeas Bond filed by James L Ratcliff. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Edstrom, Kenneth)
July 23, 2020 Filing 37 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supersedeas Bond filed by James L Ratcliff. (Edstrom, Kenneth)
July 23, 2020 Filing 36 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Rancher's Legacy Meat Co., . (Lallier, Cameron)
July 22, 2020 Filing 35 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by James L Ratcliff . (Wolpert, Robin)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER ON MOTION FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL AND MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION AND ACCELERATION OF APPEALS. 1. Ratcliff's Motion for Stay Pending Appeal (James L. Ratcliff, et al. v. Rancher's Legacy Meat Co., et al., Case No. 20-CV-834 (D. Minn.) #24 ; James L. Ratcliff, et al. v. Rancher's Legacy Meat Co., et al., Case No. 20-CV-835 (D. Minn.) #23 ; and James L. Ratcliff v. Ranchers et al., 20-CV-1343 (D. Minn.) #12 ) is GRANTED contingent upon Ratcliff posting a supersedeas bond in the amount of $6,000,000.00 within two days of the date of this opinion unless the parties come to a different agreement. Counsel for Ratcliff shall immediately notify counsel for RLM and for the Committee upon the posting of the bond and certify the same to this Court. a. So long as Ratcliff posts a supersedeas bond that is consistent with this Order, the Lien Avoidance Orders, the Sale Order, and any related judgments are stayed until further order of this Court. 2. Ratcliff's Emergency Motion for Consolidation and Acceleration of Appeals (James L. Ratcliff v. Rancher's et al., 20-CV-1343 (D. Minn.) #22 ) be GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. 3. The appeals in James L. Ratcliff, et al. v. Rancher's Legacy Meat Co., et al., Case No. 20-CV-834 (D. Minn.); James L. Ratcliff, et al. v. Ranchers Legacy Meat Co., et al., Case No. 20-CV-835 (D. Minn.); and James L. Ratcliff v. Ranchers et al., 20-CV-1343 (D. Minn.) be consolidated and jointly administered for purposes of oral argument. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 7/20/20. Associated Cases: 0:20-cv-00834-NEB, 0:20-cv-00835-NEB, 0:20-cv-01343-NEB(KMW) Modified text on 7/21/2020 (lmb).
July 15, 2020 Filing 33 Appellee's BRIEF by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, The, Rancher's Legacy Meat Co.,. Appellant Reply Brief due by 7/29/2020. (Lallier, Cameron)
June 30, 2020 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nancy E. Brasel: Motion Hearing held on 6/30/2020 re #12 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal of Bankruptcy Court's Order of June 4, 2020 filed by James L Ratcliff, #22 Emergency MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Acceleration of Appeals filed by James L Ratcliff. The motions were moved, argued and taken under advisement. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Erin Drost) (KMW)
June 24, 2020 Filing 31 REPLY re #29 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by James L Ratcliff. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Edstrom, Kenneth)
June 24, 2020 Filing 30 (Text-Only) NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #22 Emergency MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Acceleration of Appeals, #12 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal of Bankruptcy Court's Order of June 4, 2020 : The Motion Hearing set is scheduled 6/30/2020 at 3:00 PM by Video Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel.Information shall be provided to the parties regarding the Zoom connection. The public may contact chambers at 651-848-1530 to listen to this hearing by audio. (KMW)
June 22, 2020 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal of Bankruptcy Court's Order of June 4, 2020 filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, The, Rancher's Legacy Meat Co.,. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lallier, Cameron)
June 22, 2020 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 Emergency MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Acceleration of Appeals filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, The, Rancher's Legacy Meat Co.,. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Lallier, Cameron)
June 19, 2020 Filing 27 (Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS. Appellant's Response to the Motion to Consolidate Cases and Accelerate the Briefing Schedule and Hearing date shall be due on 6/22/2020 by 12:00 p.m. central time. (KMW)
June 18, 2020 Filing 26 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #22 Emergency MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Acceleration of Appeals filed by James L Ratcliff.(Edstrom, Kenneth)
June 18, 2020 Filing 25 Declaration of Kenneth C. Edstrom in Support of #22 Emergency MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Acceleration of Appeals filed by James L Ratcliff.(Edstrom, Kenneth)
June 18, 2020 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support re #22 Emergency MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Acceleration of Appeals filed by James L Ratcliff. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Edstrom, Kenneth)
June 18, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #22 Emergency MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Acceleration of Appeals : Date and time to be determined. (Edstrom, Kenneth)
June 18, 2020 Filing 22 Emergency MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Acceleration of Appeals filed by James L Ratcliff. (Edstrom, Kenneth)
June 17, 2020 Filing 21 (Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS. Responsive briefs to the motion to stay are due on 6/22/20 and the reply brief is due 6/24/20. A ruling on the motion will be made on the papers submissions. (KMW)
June 17, 2020 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE OF RECEIPT AND ASSIGNMENT IN RE: BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL (kt)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Steven W Golden for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, The; granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Bradford Jay Sandler for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, The; granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Colin Robert Robinson for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, The. Approved by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 6/16/2020. (NAH)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF DIRECTION TO THE CLERK OF COURT FOR REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel for all further proceedings. Judge Susan Richard Nelson no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 20-cv-1343 NEB. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel and by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 6/12/2020.(kt)
June 15, 2020 Filing 17 Appellant's BRIEF by James L Ratcliff. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Edstrom, Kenneth)
June 15, 2020 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #12 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal of Bankruptcy Court's Order of June 4, 2020 filed by James L Ratcliff.(Edstrom, Kenneth)
June 15, 2020 Filing 15 EXHIBIT List re #12 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal of Bankruptcy Court's Order of June 4, 2020 filed by James L Ratcliff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-I)(Edstrom, Kenneth)
June 15, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal of Bankruptcy Court's Order of June 4, 2020 filed by James L Ratcliff. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Edstrom, Kenneth)
June 12, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #12 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal of Bankruptcy Court's Order of June 4, 2020 : Date and time to be determined. (Edstrom, Kenneth)
June 12, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal of Bankruptcy Court's Order of June 4, 2020 filed by James L Ratcliff. (Edstrom, Kenneth)
June 12, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Colin R. Robinson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7796994 filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, The. (Klobucar, Jeffrey)
June 12, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bradford J. Sandler. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7796987 filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, The. (Klobucar, Jeffrey)
June 12, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Steven W. Golden. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7796962 filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, The. (Klobucar, Jeffrey)
June 12, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, The . (Klobucar, Jeffrey)
June 12, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(1), the Clerk of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Minnesota gives notice that the record for this appeal is available electronically.(sd)
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 STATEMENT OF ISSUES by Appellant James L Ratcliff.(sd)
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by James L Ratcliff . (Edstrom, Kenneth)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Bradford Jay Sandler, Colin Robert Robinson as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (CLK)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Bankruptcy) list. Please use case number 20-cv-1343 SRN. (CLK)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 6/3/2020. Court Reporter: Susan Newsom. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/8/2020.(sd)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of APPEAL from United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Minnesota. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-32928. filed by James L Ratcliff. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Notice on Appel, #2 Election to U.S. District Court, #3 Identification of Residence, #4 Order on Appeal, #5 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet) (sd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James L Ratcliff v. Rancher's Legacy Meat Co., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rancher's Legacy Meat Co.,
Represented By: Cameron A Lallier
Represented By: Thomas J Lallier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By: Colin Robert Robinson
Represented By: Bradford Jay Sandler
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Klobucar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, The
Represented By: Colin Robert Robinson
Represented By: Bradford Jay Sandler
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Klobucar
Represented By: Steven W Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: James L Ratcliff
Represented By: Craig T Dokken
Represented By: Kenneth C. Edstrom
Represented By: Mark V Steffenson
Represented By: Demetria Laparis Dyer
Represented By: Robin M Wolpert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?