Shaw v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Lynn Shaw
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 0:2020cv01344
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 Stipulation,. (Santos, Margaret)
August 7, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, #7 Waiver of Service Executed Stipulation for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. Jointly Signed by Lynn Shaw. (Santos, Margaret)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel Keenan Ryan for Life Insurance Company of North America. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/2/2020. (NAH)
July 1, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 6/11/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (Santos, Margaret)
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7845947 filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret)
July 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Ann Santos on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret)
June 15, 2020 Filing 4 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (KNK)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 20-cv-1344 (WMW/TNL). (KNK)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7792779) filed by Lynn Shaw. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (McCartin, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaw v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Shaw
Represented By: Joseph McCartin
Represented By: Stephen J Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Margaret Ann Santos
Represented By: Jake Elrich
Represented By: Daniel Keenan Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?