Jenkins v. MCTC Accuraccy Placement Test et al
Plaintiff: Ardell Levert Jenkins
Defendant: Department of Motor Vechecle, MCTC Accuraccy Placement Test and Fam Wise Car Dealership
Case Number: 0:2020cv01356
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Filing 5 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(CLK)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER adopting #3 Report and Recommendation: denying #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 7/13/2020. (SMD)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Ardell Levert Jenkins filed by Ardell Levert Jenkins, #1 Complaint, filed by Ardell Levert Jenkins Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 6/25/2020.(TMA)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Ardell Levert Jenkins. (NAH) Document QC'd on 7/17/2020 (MMG).
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of Motor Vechecle, Fam Wise Car Dealership, MCTC Accuraccy Placement Test filed by Ardell Levert Jenkins. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (NAH) Document QC'd on 7/17/2020 (MMG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins v. MCTC Accuraccy Placement Test et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ardell Levert Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Motor Vechecle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCTC Accuraccy Placement Test
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fam Wise Car Dealership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?